EP1226035 - COMPENSATION DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE CLOTH IN APPARATUS FOR CLEANING THE CYLINDERS OF PRINTING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corti, Marco Via Fornaci, 16 23900 Lecco / IT | For all designated states Fumagalli, Riccardo Via Baravico, 41 23848 Oggiono / IT | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Dino c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Porsia, Dino, Dr. c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 00966163.8 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000EP10047 | Priority number, date | IT1999GE00125 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: IT GE990125 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0130575 | Date: | 03.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1226035 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226035 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B41F35/00 (EP);
B41P2235/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 14.05.2002 | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHSANORDNUNG ZUM KONTROLLIEREN DES TUCHES IN EINER REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRUCKMASCHINENZYLINDER | [2002/31] | English: | COMPENSATION DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE CLOTH IN APPARATUS FOR CLEANING THE CYLINDERS OF PRINTING MACHINES | [2002/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER L'ESSUYEUR DANS UN NETTOYEUR DE CYLINDRES DE MACHINES A IMPRIMER | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | CY | 12.10.2005 | IE | 12.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/08] | ES | 02.03.2005 | |
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 02.03.2005 | |
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2538067 (MOESTUE HANS JACOB DIPL ING) [Y] 3,4 * page 4, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]DE3005469 (BALDWIN GEGENHEIMER CORP) [Y] 3,4 * page 18, paragraph L - page 25, paragraph 4; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0315144 (B J TRADING KK [JP]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0636476 (ELETTRA SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-4 * see abstract; column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0781657 (BALDWIN NIPPON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * see abstract; column 14, line 15 - column 15, line 21; figures 1,2,21-26 * |