Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263560

EP1263560 - IMPROVED CONTAINER AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING THE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pechiney Plastic Packaging, Inc.
8770 West Bryn Mawr Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60631 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
Pechiney Plastic Packaging, Inc.
8770 West Bryn Mawr Avenue Chicago
Illinois 60631 / US
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Pechiney Plastic Packaging, Inc.
8770 West Bryn Mawr Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60631 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JACKSON, Douglas, J.
132 Chestnut Drive
Wayne, NJ 07470 / US
02 / KING, Daniel, L.
92 Sherman Ridge Road
Sussex, NJ 07461 / US
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Hackett, Sean James
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Hackett, Sean James
Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date00966723.915.09.2000
[2002/50]
WO2000US25192
Priority number, dateUS20000189868P16.03.2000         Original published format: US 189868 P
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0170474
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1263560
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1263560
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.09.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B29C33/42, B29C45/14, B29C45/00, B65D35/12
[2003/23]
Former International [2002/50]B29C33/42, B29C45/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER BEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN DES BEHÄLTERS[2002/50]
English:IMPROVED CONTAINER AND METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING THE CONTAINER[2002/50]
French:CONTENANT AMELIORE, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION DUDIT CONTENANT[2002/50]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2002National basic fee paid 
04.09.2002Search fee paid 
04.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
16.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2006Fee for grant paid
07.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT03.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US2788544  (BERTRAND VOUMARD, et al) [X] 1,3-12 * column 4, line 5; figures 8,10 * * column 4, line 61 *;
 [YX]US2313031  (PARKHURST FREDERIC A) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 38 * * column 1, line 49 - line 55 * * column 2, line 33 - line 36 * * column 2, line 44 - line 47; figure 3 * [X] 3-12;
 [Y]DE1080297  (TUBOPLAST SA) [Y] 1,2 * figure 2 *;
 [YX]FR1305166  (PROPLASTEX) [Y] 1,2 * figure 1 * [X] 3-12;
 [A]CH245861  (WALTZ PAUL [CH]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 6 - line 7; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4117950  (ALLEN DAVID O) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 28; figure 4 * * column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 25 - line 28 * * column 2, line 44 - line 46 *;
 [A]US4470521  (SCAMMELL JOHN F [AU]) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 4 - line 14; figure 9 *;
 [A]GB1038897  (METAL BOX CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 30 * * page 1, line 40 * * page 1, line 46 - line 48 * * page 2, line 106 - line 111 *;
 [A]DE2118841  (BLATTERT ERICH) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 25 - line 32 * * column 2, line 50 - line 54 * * column 2, line 58 * * column 3, line 15 - line 16 * * column 3, line 46 - line 50 *
International search[Y]US4518554  (HATAKEYAMA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4988472  (ORIMOTO HIROYUKI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5219373  (HATAKEYAMA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5447674  (SCHELLENBACH FRANK [DE]);
 [Y]US5705112  (GRAM JES TOUGAARD [DK])