Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1226586

EP1226586 - FLASH MEMORY WORDLINE TRACKING ACROSS WHOLE CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Shigekasu
5636 Stevens Creek Blvd., 391
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / BILL, Colin, S.
1384 Rose Garden Lane
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
03 / VANBUSKIRK, Michael, A.
18653 Vessing Road
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
 [2002/31]
Representative(s)Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher
Brookes Batchellor, 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher
Brookes Batchellor, 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date00967094.429.09.2000
[2002/31]
WO2000US26814
Priority number, dateUS1999043129629.10.1999         Original published format: US 431296
[2002/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0133571
Date:10.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1226586
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001
[2002/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1226586
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11C16/28, G11C8/00
[2002/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WORTLEITUNGSSIGNALE EINER FLASHSPEICHER BLEIBEN ÜBERALL AUF DEM CHIP VERLUSTFREI[2002/31]
English:FLASH MEMORY WORDLINE TRACKING ACROSS WHOLE CHIP[2002/31]
French:POURSUITE D'UNE LIGNE DE MOTS DE MEMOIRE FLASH A TRAVERS LA TOTALITE DE LA PUCE[2002/31]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2002National basic fee paid 
23.01.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/31]
10.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2003Fee for grant paid
10.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
FR18.06.2003
IT18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY29.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
IE29.09.2003
LU29.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2006/14]AT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
FR18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY29.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
IE29.09.2003
LU29.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
Former [2005/02]AT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY29.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
IE29.09.2003
LU29.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
Former [2004/40]AT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY29.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
IE29.09.2003
LU29.09.2003
Former [2004/39]AT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY29.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
LU29.09.2003
Former [2004/36]AT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY29.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/29]AT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/28]AT18.06.2003
BE18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/13]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/02]CH18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
Former [2004/01]CH18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9927537  (MACRONIX INT CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-4 * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 18; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5859798  (YERO EMILIO MIGUEL [FR]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 1; figure 1 *