blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1202802 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1202802



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 366
20.07.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.12.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
01.12.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
19.11.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
05.08.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.06.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.06.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
24.06.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
22.06.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 17
22.06.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 17
11.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
18.02.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.02.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.02.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
22.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 6
22.08.2003 Description Search / examination 3
22.08.2003 Drawings Search / examination 5
22.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.03.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.01.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
19.12.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
04.12.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.12.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.12.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
04.12.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.12.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.08.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.08.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.08.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 38
10.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 30
27.03.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.03.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.03.2001 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.03.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
01.03.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.02.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.02.2001 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36
23.10.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.10.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 6
23.10.2000 Description International Searching Authority 20
23.10.2000 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
23.10.2000 Drawings International Searching Authority 8