blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1202802


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.12.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2008  [2008/03]
27.07.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2007  [2007/35]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
22.07.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.09.2005  [2005/36]
27.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2005  [2005/28]
20.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2005  [2005/27]
18.03.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.05.2005  [2005/18]
11.02.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.03.2005  [2005/13]
28.01.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2005  [2005/11]
21.01.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2005  [2005/10]
30.07.2004 (Expected) grant published on  15.09.2004  [2004/38]
23.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.02.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.09.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.04.2003 First examination report
16.04.2003 Examination report or reply
14.10.2002 Change - extension states
04.09.2002 Renewal fee
22.03.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.05.2002  [2002/19]
22.03.2002 Request for examination filed published on  08.05.2002  [2002/19]
05.03.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
19.02.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
26.02.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
18.01.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.2000 PCT data prior to European publication