blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1202802
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0112327Global Dossier 22.02.2001A1
Priority number Date
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8268633Global Dossier 18.09.2012B2
US2007227890 04.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
US37312903 24.02.2003
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
US69678507 05.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7238268Global Dossier 03.07.2007B2
US2004007463 15.01.2004A1
Priority number Date
US37312903 24.02.2003
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20020043553Global Dossier 10.06.2002A
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2003507162Global Dossier 25.02.2003A
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1202802Global Dossier 15.09.2004B1
EP1202802 08.05.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT276044T 15.10.2004T
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU768135B 04.12.2003B2
AU7758600 13.03.2001A
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2380614 13.11.2007C
CA2380614 22.02.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60013848T 22.09.2005T2
DE60013848D 21.10.2004D1
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA02001437 02.07.2002A
Priority number Date
US0040620 10.08.2000
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1378485 06.11.2002A
Priority number Date
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6524456 25.02.2003B1
Priority number Date
US14850299 12.08.1999
US40806099 29.09.1999