Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1202802

EP1202802 - MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES FOR THE CONTROLLED MANIPULATION OF SMALL VOLUMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UT-Battelle, LLC
Oak Ridge National Laboratory, P.O. Box 2008
Oak Ridge, TN 37831-6255 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]For all designated states
UT-Battelle, LLC
Oak Ridge National Laboratory, P.O. Box 2008
Oak Ridge, TN 37831-6255 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAMSEY, J., Michael
733 Hampton Roads Drive
Knoxville, TN 37922 / US
02 / JACOBSON, Stephen, C.
3639 Taliluna Drive, D-1
Knoxville, TN 37919 / US
 [2002/19]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00967377.310.08.2000
[2002/19]
WO2000US40620
Priority number, dateUS19990148502P12.08.1999         Original published format: US 148502 P
US1999040806029.09.1999         Original published format: US 408060
[2002/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0112327
Date:22.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1202802
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001
[2002/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1202802
Date:15.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, B01J19/00
[2002/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROFLUID-VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR GESTEUERTEN HANDHABUNG VON KLEINSTVOLUMEN[2002/19]
English:MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES FOR THE CONTROLLED MANIPULATION OF SMALL VOLUMES[2002/19]
French:DISPOSITIFS A MICROFLUIDES POUR LA MANIPULATION CONTROLEE DE PETITS VOLUMES[2002/19]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2002National basic fee paid 
12.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
22.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2004Fee for grant paid
22.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.09.2004
BE15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
IT15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
PT15.02.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT15.09.2004
BE15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
IT15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2006/14]AT15.09.2004
BE15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/46]AT15.09.2004
BE15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/28]AT15.09.2004
BE15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/27]AT15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT15.09.2004
FI15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE15.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9800231  (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,5-16 * page 24, line 13 - page 25, line 12 * * page 30, line 11 - line 24 * * page 33, line 8 - page 37, line 3; figures 2A,2B,5 * * page 38, line 8 - line 16; figure 4 * [A] 2-4,17-29;
 [XA]EP0815940  (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 15 - line 42 * * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 42 * * column 9, line 48 - column 10, line 20 * * column 15, line 36 - column 16, line 37 * [A] 17;
 [A]US4908112  (PACE SALVATORE J [US]) [A] 1-4,17,18,22 * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 19; figure - *;
 [A]EP0616218  (HITACHI LTD [JP])