Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1226692

EP1226692 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
???moredetails.lapse.edited??? GB
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPCom GmbH & Co. KG
Zugspitzstrasse 15
82049 Pullach / DE
[2007/35]
Former [2006/39]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HANS, Martin
Spandauer Weg 9
31141 Hildesheim / DE
02 / BECKMANN, Mark
Vogelweg 7
31789 Hameln / DE
 [2002/31]
Representative(s)Molnia, David , et al
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]Molnia, David , et al
df-mp
Fünf Höfe
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2009/51]Molnia, David , et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2008/07]Molnia, David , et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2007/35]Gigerich, Jan , et al
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date00967581.019.09.2000
[2002/31]
WO2000DE03247
Priority number, dateDE199915065321.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19950653
[2002/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0130042
Date:26.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1226692
Date:31.07.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001
[2002/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1226692
Date:27.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/39]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1226692
Date:24.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/17]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP10.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W28/06, H04L29/08
[2013/17]
Former International [2012/32]H04L29/06, H04L12/56, H04W28/06, H04L29/08
Former International [2006/18]H04L29/06, H04L12/56, H04Q7/30
Former International [2002/31]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2002/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MOBILFUNKNETZES[2002/31]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONE NETWORK[2002/31]
French:PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN RESEAU DE TELEPHONIE MOBILE[2006/18]
Former [2002/31]PROC D POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN RESEAU DE TELEPHONIE MOBILE
Entry into regional phase21.05.2002National basic fee paid 
10.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
01.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2006Fee for grant paid
10.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06113477.1  / EP1686760
EP10182497.7  / EP2378735
EP10182505.7  / EP2378736
EP14200143.7  / EP2890082
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Jacoby, Georg, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
 02  04.08.2008  10.12.2010  WITHDRAWN
RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  27.09.2010  27.09.2010  INTERVENTION
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/04]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Jacoby, Georg, et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  04.08.2008  13.08.2008  WITHDRAWN
RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  27.09.2010  27.09.2010  INTERVENTION
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2011/03]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Jacoby, Georg, et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  04.08.2008  13.08.2008  INTERVENTION WITHDRAWN
RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  27.09.2010  27.09.2010  INTERVENTION
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2010/44]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Jacoby, Georg, et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  04.08.2008  13.08.2008  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  27.09.2010  27.09.2010  INTERVENTION
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County 330 / TW
Opponent's representative
Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [2010/44]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Jacoby, Georg, et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  04.08.2008  13.08.2008  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2010/14]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Jacoby, Georg, et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 02  04.08.2008  13.08.2008  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Lovells LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/52]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Kalliola, Sanna Marketta, et al
Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A
00100 Helsinki / FI
 02  04.08.2008  13.08.2008  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Lovells LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/38]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Kalliola, Sanna Marketta, et al
Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A
00100 Helsinki / FI
 02  04.08.2008  13.08.2008  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/37]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Kalliola, Sanna Marketta, et al
Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A
00100 Helsinki / FI
 02  04.08.2008  07.08.2008  INTERVENTION
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/44]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007  09.08.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Kalliola, Sanna Marketta, et al
Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A
00100 Helsinki / FI
Former [2007/31]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2007   
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 2-4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Kalliola, Sanna Marketta, et al
Espatent Oy Tekniikantie 14
02150 Espoo / FI
21.08.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.12.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2012Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.07.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.08.2012Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.01.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.03.2013Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition25.03.2010Appeal received No.  T0444/10
25.05.2010Statement of grounds filed
20.07.2011Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
26.02.2010Appeal received No.  T0444/10
25.05.2010Statement of grounds filed
20.07.2011Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
03.03.2010Appeal received No.  T0444/10
03.05.2010Statement of grounds filed
20.07.2011Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
19.07.2011Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB01.02.2012
[2015/21]
Former [2007/45]deleted
Former [2007/35]IT27.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9748212  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 31 * * figures 2A,2B *;
 [X]DE19847679  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 26 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9621984  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 34 - page 7, line 27 * * page 16, line 9 - line 27 * * figures 1-4 *