Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317390

EP1317390 - MULTI-DIRECTIONAL CHAIN LINK ASSEMBLY FOR MULTILEVEL OVERLAPPING SLAT CONVEYORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MILEWICZ, Mark
10 Kedumba Cresent
Turramurra, New South Wales 2074 / AU
 [2003/24]
Application number, filing date00967622.216.08.2000
[2003/24]
WO2000EP08004
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0214190
Date:21.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317390
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317390
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65G17/38
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIDIREKTIONALER KETTENGLIEDZUSAMMENBAU FÜR ÜBERLAPPENDE MULTILEVEL LATTENFÖRDERER[2005/15]
English:MULTI-DIRECTIONAL CHAIN LINK ASSEMBLY FOR MULTILEVEL OVERLAPPING SLAT CONVEYORS[2003/24]
French:ENSEMBLE DE CHAINES A MAILLONS MULTIDIRECTIONNELS POUR CONVOYEURS A LATTES A RECOUVREMENT MULTINIVEAUX[2005/15]
Former [2003/24]MULTIDIREKTIONALER KETTENGLIEDZUSAMMENBAU FÜR MULTILVEL OVERLAPPENDE LATTENFÖRDERER
Former [2003/24]ENSEMBLE DE CHAINE A MAILLONS MULTIDIRECTIONNELLE POUR TRANSPORTEURS A LATTES A RECOUVREMENT MULTINIVEAUX
Entry into regional phase13.03.2003National basic fee paid 
13.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
03.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2005Fee for grant paid
04.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
16.03.200303   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2003
31.08.200304   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
CY23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
GB16.08.2006
IE16.08.2006
LU16.08.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
GB16.08.2006
IE16.08.2006
LU16.08.2006
Former [2007/50]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
GB16.08.2006
IE16.08.2006
Former [2007/45]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
IE16.08.2006
Former [2007/42]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
IT23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
IE16.08.2006
Former [2007/35]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
IT23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
Former [2006/48]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
Former [2006/38]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/33]CH23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/23]FI23.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US3589503  (LEACH JOHN M) [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB665885  (FISHER & LUDLOW LTD) [A] 1 * figure 2 *