EP1222393 - SUBMERSIBLE MOTOR WITH SHAFT SEALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lawrence Pumps Inc. 371 Market Street Lawrence, MA 01843-1595 / US | [2002/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDREWS, Dale 14 Scenic Drive Derry, NH 03038 / US | 02 /
RUSSELL, Paul 24 Morning Dove Road Kingston, NH 03848 / US | 03 /
WITZGALL, Michael 52 Island Pond Road Derry, NH 03038 / US | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00968505.8 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US26898 | Priority number, date | US19990157702P | 04.10.1999 Original published format: US 157702 P | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0125634 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222393 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222393 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04B17/00 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
F04D29/108 (EP);
F04D13/086 (EP);
F04D29/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAUCHMOTOR MIT WELLENDICHTUNGEN | [2002/29] | English: | SUBMERSIBLE MOTOR WITH SHAFT SEALS | [2002/29] | French: | MOTEUR SUBMERSIBLE DOTE DE BOITES D'ETANCHEITE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 24.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US2545422 (BLOM CARL J) [XD] 8-11 * column 3, lines 18-60; figure 2 * [Y] 16; | [A]US4614482 (GAFFAL KARL [DE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 29-53 * * column 4, lines 7-39 *; | [A]US5007798 (KEANE BRIAN [AU]) [A] 1,13,17,18,20* abstract *; | [A]US5211532 (THOMPSON PETER [GB]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, lines 9-57 *; | [YD]US5938205 (AZIBERT HENRI V [US], et al) [YD] 16 * column 1, lines 33-45; figures 7,8 * | International search | [Y]US2545422 (BLOM CARL J); | [Y]US2581504 (WILFLEY ELMER R, et al); | [A]DE2406918 (HOCHTEMPERATUR REAKTORBAU GMBH); | [A]US3960245 (WEINRICH HELLMUT); | [Y]US5938205 (AZIBERT HENRI V [US], et al) |