Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235768

EP1235768 - HYDROCARBONACEOUS COMPOSITION CONTAINING ODOR SUPPRESSANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ronyak, Alan Jeffrey
5705 Vines Road
Howell, MI 48843 / US
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Crisp, David Norman , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Crisp, David Norman , et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00968648.604.10.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US27315
Priority number, dateUS1999044097616.11.1999         Original published format: US 440976
US2000054112531.03.2000         Original published format: US 541125
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0136354
Date:25.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235768
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235768
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1235768
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.05.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07C7/20, C09D7/12, C09D195/00, C10L1/10, C08L95/00, C10L1/00, C08K5/07, C08K5/101
[2003/02]
Former International [2002/36]C07C7/20, C09D7/12, C09D195/00, C10L1/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERUCHSUNTERDRÜCKER ENTHALTENDE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFHALTIGE ZUBEREITUNG[2002/36]
English:HYDROCARBONACEOUS COMPOSITION CONTAINING ODOR SUPPRESSANT[2002/36]
French:COMPOSITION HYDROCARBONEE CONTENANT DES AGENTS DE SUPPRESSION D'ODEUR[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2002National basic fee paid 
07.06.2002Search fee paid 
07.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
04.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2005Fee for grant paid
04.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.12.2005   
BP Oil International Limited
Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW 16 7BP / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Nicholas David
BP International Limited
Patents and Agreements Division
Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2006/06]
Opponent(s)01  14.12.2005   
BP Oil International Limited
Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW 16 7BP / GB
Opponent's representative
Perkins, Nicholas David
BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
20.01.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.05.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.03.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.04.2007
23.03.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.04.2007Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.11.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.03.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.06.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
NL16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
SE16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY04.10.2005
IE04.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
[2008/07]
Former [2007/20]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
NL16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
CY04.10.2005
IE04.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2007/08]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
NL16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE04.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/48]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
NL16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE04.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/30]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
NL16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/14]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
NL16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
GR16.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/12]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
DK16.06.2005
Former [2005/51]AT16.03.2005
FI16.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI16.03.2005
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5271767  (LIGHT SR TERRY J [US], et al);
 [A]US5362316  (PARADISE RICHARD W [US])