Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1222475

EP1222475 - EASY TO PROGRAM AUTOMATIC TEST EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2006  [2006/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teradyne, Inc.
321 Harrison Avenue
Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]For all designated states
TERADYNE, INC.
321 Harrison Avenue
Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KITTROSS, Andrew, W.
21 Putnam Street
Beverly, MA 01915 / US
02 / RYAN, Allan, M.
10 Shawnee Circle
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
 [2002/29]
Representative(s)Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date00968954.812.10.2000
[2002/29]
WO2000US28424
Priority number, dateUS1999041703412.10.1999         Original published format: US 417034
[2002/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0127645
Date:19.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1222475
Date:17.07.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001
[2002/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/319, G01R31/3183
[2002/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/29]
TitleGerman:LEICHT ZU PROGRAMMIERENDES AUTOMATISCHES TESTGERÄT[2002/29]
English:EASY TO PROGRAM AUTOMATIC TEST EQUIPMENT[2002/29]
French:EQUIPEMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'ESSAI FACILE A PROGRAMMER[2002/29]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2002National basic fee paid 
24.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
29.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/20]
16.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2658933  (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * page 27, lines 4-15; figure 3 * * page 12, line 12 - page 13, line 15 * * page 10, lines 9-19 * * page 8, lines 11-24 *;
 [X]  - R. HUTSON, Notes, Tutorial 8, Digital Test Applications,, WASHINGTON DC USA, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, TEST TECHNOLOGY TECHNICAL COMITTEE, (19981018), XP002157245 [X] 1-23 * figures 2-1 *
 [A]  - MASCIOLA J A ET AL, "A SOFTWARE ARCHITECTURE FOR MIXED SIGNAL FUNCTIONAL TESTING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19941002), ISBN 0-7803-2103-0, pages 580 - 586, XP000520019 [A] 7,15 * abstract *