Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236233

EP1236233 - PRODUCTION OF CATALYST LAYERS ON MEMBRANES FOR LOW-TEMPERATURE FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GUPTA, Ashok, Kumar
Victor-Gollancz-Strasse 53
52428 Jülich / DE
02 / TIETZ, Frank
Dr.-Weyer-Strasse 18
52428 Jülich / DE
03 / BUCHKREMER, Hans, Peter
Im Mühlenkamp 31
52525 Heinsberg / DE
04 / KUNDLER, Isabel
Steinstrasser Allee 19
52428 Jülich / DE
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2002/36]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00969506.514.10.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000EP10129
Priority number, dateDE199915193628.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19951936
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0131725
Date:03.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236233
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236233
Date:04.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/88, H01M8/10
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON KATALYSATORSCHICHTEN AUF MEMBRANEN FÜR NIEDERTEMPERATUR-BRENNSTOFFZELLEN[2002/36]
English:PRODUCTION OF CATALYST LAYERS ON MEMBRANES FOR LOW-TEMPERATURE FUEL CELLS[2002/36]
French:PRODUCTION DE COUCHES CATALYTIQUES SUR DES MEMBRANES POUR CELLULES ELECTROCHIMIQUES A BASSE TEMPERATURE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2001National basic fee paid 
19.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/43]
13.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2003Fee for grant paid
25.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
IT04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]CY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
IT04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2007/08]CY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2006/12]FI04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2005/02]FI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/46]FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0945910  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-9,12 * page 4, lines 11-56 * * example - *;
 [A]DE19616160  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, lines 20-27 * * page 4, lines 22-35 * * examples 1,2 *;
 [A]US5330860  (GROT WALTHER G [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 29 * * column 5, lines 15-41 *;
 [A]US5861222  (FISCHER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 7, lines 18-49 * * example 1 *;
 [DA]DE3334330  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * page 4, lines 25-30 * * page 6, lines 13-21 *