Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242942

EP1242942 - PLANNING AND ADMINISTRATING A MANUFACTURING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manufacturing Channel Europe LTD
Veikkointie 4
03100 Nummela / FI
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / CASSERLY, James
Karnaistentie 261
FIN-08350 Routio / FI
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Virkkala, Antero Jukka
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Virkkala, Jukka Antero
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date00969604.818.10.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000FI00903
Priority number, dateFI1999000225619.10.1999         Original published format: FI 992256
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0129717
Date:26.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242942
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE26.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLANUNG UND VERWALTUNG EINER FERTIGUNGSANALYSE[2002/39]
English:PLANNING AND ADMINISTRATING A MANUFACTURING PLANT[2002/39]
French:PLANIFICATION ET ADMINISTRATION D'UNE USINE DE FABRICATION[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2002National basic fee paid 
03.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
03.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
01.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/45]
07.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9712335  (HALBLAENDER J STEFAN [DE]);
 [A]US5369570  (PARAD HARVEY A [US])