Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1225838

EP1225838 - EXPANDABLE ORTHOPEDIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Levy, Mark
12/12 Hasajlav Street
43554 Raanana / IL
[2005/01]
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
Levy, Mark
12/12 Hasajlav Street
43554 Raana / IL
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/31]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date00969786.319.10.2000
[2002/31]
WO2000IL00666
Priority number, dateUS1999042656322.10.1999         Original published format: US 426563
[2002/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0128443
Date:26.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1225838
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001
[2002/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1225838
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/72
[2002/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXPANDIERBARE ORTHOPÄDISCHE ANORDNUNG[2002/31]
English:EXPANDABLE ORTHOPEDIC DEVICE[2002/31]
French:DISPOSITIF ORTHOPEDIQUE EXTENSIBLE[2002/31]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2002National basic fee paid 
22.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/31]
19.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2004Fee for grant paid
21.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04030532.8  / EP1522268
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
FR29.12.2004
IT29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
PT29.05.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
FR29.12.2004
IT29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2007/09]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
FR29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
SE29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/32]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
FR29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/14]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
NL29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
DK29.03.2005
GR29.03.2005
ES09.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT29.12.2004
BE29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT29.12.2004
FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/26]FI29.12.2004
GR29.03.2005
Former [2005/24]FI29.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3922044  (RICHTER TURTUR MATTHIAS DR [DE]) [X] 38-40,42,44,46 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 40; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [Y]EP0882431  (BARTOLOMEI CLAUDIO DI [IT], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,9,10,17,21-24,28,29 * column 2, line 24 - line 38 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,7 *;
 [Y]DE19612276  (MEDICAD ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,5 * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 1; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]WO9838918  (BEYAR MORDECHAY [IL], et al) [Y] 1,9,10,17,21-24,28,29 * page 36, paragraph 2 - page 37, paragraph 3; figures 4A,4B *;
 [A]SU967478  (EDINAK ALEKSEJ N) [A] 2,3,5 * figures 1,2 *
by applicantWO9838918
 US5281225