Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320484

EP1320484 - AN HYDRAULIC ACTUATOR FOR VEHICLES CONTROLLABLE BY HANDLEBARS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 31.10.2012  [2012/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freni Brembo S.p.A.
Via Brembo, 25
24035 Curno (Bergamo) / IT
[2010/33]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Freni Brembo S.p.A.
Via Brembo, 25
24035 Curno, Bergamo / IT
Inventor(s)01 / LAVEZZI, Roberto
Via G. Donizetti, 75
I-24030 Brembate Di Sopra, Bergamo / IT
 [2010/29]
Former [2003/26]01 / LAVEZZI, Roberto
Via G. Donizetti, 75
I-24030 Brembate Di Sopra / IT
Representative(s)Crippa, Paolo Ernesto , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2010/29]Crippa, Paolo Ernesto , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2007/35]Crippa, Paolo Ernesto , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11
25122 Brescia / IT
Former [2003/26]Siniscalco, Fabio , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00969806.929.09.2000
[2003/26]
WO2000IT00386
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0228701
Date:11.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320484
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320484
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:B62L3/02, B60T11/16, B60T11/22
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE BETÄTIGUNSEINRICHTUNG FÜR VON LENKSTANGEN STEUERBAHRE FAHRZEUGE[2003/26]
English:AN HYDRAULIC ACTUATOR FOR VEHICLES CONTROLLABLE BY HANDLEBARS[2003/26]
French:ACTIONNEUR HYDRAULIQUE POUR VÉHICULES DIRIGÉS PAR UN GUIDON[2010/11]
Former [2003/26]ACTIONNEUR HYDRAULIQUE POUR V HICULES DIRIG S PAR UN GUIDON
Entry into regional phase29.09.2000Translation filed 
20.02.2003National basic fee paid 
20.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
05.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2010Fee for grant paid
11.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30]
Request for further processing for:25.08.2004Request for further processing filed
25.08.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.09.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
24.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.08.2010
BE18.08.2010
CY18.08.2010
DK18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
NL18.08.2010
SE18.08.2010
IE29.09.2010
LU29.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
FR18.10.2010
GR19.11.2010
ES29.11.2010
PT20.12.2010
[2012/44]
Former [2011/35]AT18.08.2010
BE18.08.2010
CY18.08.2010
DK18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
NL18.08.2010
SE18.08.2010
IE29.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
FR18.10.2010
GR19.11.2010
ES29.11.2010
PT20.12.2010
Former [2011/31]AT18.08.2010
BE18.08.2010
CY18.08.2010
DK18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
NL18.08.2010
SE18.08.2010
MC30.09.2010
GR19.11.2010
ES29.11.2010
PT20.12.2010
Former [2011/19]AT18.08.2010
BE18.08.2010
CY18.08.2010
DK18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
NL18.08.2010
SE18.08.2010
MC30.09.2010
GR19.11.2010
PT20.12.2010
Former [2011/17]AT18.08.2010
BE18.08.2010
CY18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
NL18.08.2010
SE18.08.2010
GR19.11.2010
PT20.12.2010
Former [2011/15]AT18.08.2010
CY18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
SE18.08.2010
GR19.11.2010
PT20.12.2010
Former [2011/13]AT18.08.2010
CY18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
PT20.12.2010
Former [2011/10]AT18.08.2010
FI18.08.2010
PT20.12.2010
Former [2011/08]AT18.08.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US4528895  (NAKAMURA KAORU [JP]) [X] 1-4,11,17-19,26 * column W *;
 [X]GB1245542  (WODESLAVSKY JOSEF [IL]) [X] 1-3,15,18,26 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE4423621  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,4-9,11-13,17,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0435110  (SHELLHAUSE RONALD L [US]) [A] 1,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5020326  (BARKER DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1,20-23 * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 48; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US3802200  (KOLM R) [A] 1,26 * column W *;
 [A]JPS60131357
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851120), vol. 009, no. 294, Database accession no. (M - 431), [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE203506