Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1221851 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1221851



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1495
15.09.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
15.09.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
09.09.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
01.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.09.2011 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
01.09.2011 French translation of claims Opposition 2
01.09.2011 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
01.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
11.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
15.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
10.06.2011 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
08.06.2011 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 21
10.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.03.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
09.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
07.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.03.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.02.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.02.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 21
22.02.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
22.02.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.02.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
17.09.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
17.09.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
30.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Description Opposition 2
17.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
10.05.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
10.05.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
01.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
18.02.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
23.10.2009 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 12
29.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.07.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
14.07.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.09.2008 Claims Appeal 2
17.09.2008 Claims Appeal 2
17.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2008 Claims Appeal 2
16.09.2008 Claims Appeal 2
16.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.09.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
01.01.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.12.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.2007 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2007 Claims Appeal 2
17.12.2007 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2007 Claims Appeal 2
17.12.2007 Claims Appeal 1
17.12.2007 Claims Appeal 2
17.12.2007 Claims Appeal 2
17.12.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.12.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 13
27.07.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.07.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
15.03.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 1
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Claims Appeal 2
12.03.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
09.03.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 25
22.01.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.01.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
03.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.01.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.12.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
11.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.10.2006 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
31.10.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
31.10.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
30.10.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
30.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
30.10.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.10.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
13.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.09.2006 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.2006 Claims Opposition 12
21.07.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
13.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
13.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
13.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
13.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
13.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
13.07.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
13.07.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.07.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
11.07.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
01.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.05.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.05.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
11.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2006 Claims Opposition 2
28.03.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
27.03.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
26.01.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
26.01.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.01.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.01.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
12.01.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.01.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
11.01.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.12.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.07.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.07.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.06.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.06.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
15.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
14.06.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
05.08.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
15.06.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.06.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.06.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.02.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.02.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.02.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
10.11.2003 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
25.10.2003 Description Search / examination 19
25.10.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
24.10.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 20
21.08.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.05.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.05.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
05.04.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.02.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
24.02.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
05.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.01.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.07.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.07.2002 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2002 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2002 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.06.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.06.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
27.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.04.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
12.12.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
16.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.11.2001 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.11.2001 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.11.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.11.2001 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.10.2001 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
18.10.2001 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.07.2001 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.07.2001 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
16.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 48
16.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 76
16.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 74
16.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 78
16.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 82
16.05.2001 Priority document Search / examination 76
07.05.2001 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
26.04.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 45
27.03.2001 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2001 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.03.2001 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
10.11.2000 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.11.2000 Claims International Searching Authority 2
10.11.2000 Description International Searching Authority 42
10.11.2000 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1