Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235878

EP1235878 - EXTRUDABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LI
published on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Noveon, Inc.
9911 Brecksville Road
Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US
[2006/38]
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
Noveon IP Holdings Corp.
9911 Brecksville Road
Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Noveon IP Holdings Corp.
9911 Brecksville Road
Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ONDER, Kemel
8476 Timber Trail
Brecksville, OH 44141 / US
02 / LOEBER, George, Hunter
617 North Abbe Road
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
03 / VONTORCIK, Joseph, J.
1468 Golden Lane
Broadview, OH 44147 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]Weber, Thomas , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2002/36]Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00971022.924.10.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US29323
Priority number, dateUS1999045781109.12.1999         Original published format: US 457811
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0142363
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235878
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235878
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08L75/04
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXTRUDIERBARE POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODE ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2002/36]
English:EXTRUDABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING THEM[2002/36]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE POLYURETHANE EXTRUDABLES ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DESDITES COMPOSITIONS[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2002National basic fee paid 
15.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
30.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2005Fee for grant paid
31.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.12.2005
CY28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
PT29.05.2006
[2015/26]
Former [2009/02]AT28.12.2005
CY28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2007/50]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2007/35]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
IT28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/51]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/48]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
Former [2006/42]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
SE28.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI28.12.2005
SE28.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI28.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0520729  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * example 1; claims 1,5,6,8 * [A] 15;
 [XA]US3751520  (YASUDA T) [X] 1,4,6,7 * column 1, line 54 - line 56; claim 1 * [A] 15