Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235659

EP1235659 - SET CONSISTING OF A TOOL AND SPINDLE, WITH CLAMPING BY CENTRIFUGAL FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 20.12.2006  [2006/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ballado Investments Inc.
54th Str., Nueva Urbanizacion Obarrio, Arango Orillac Build. 3rd Floor
Panama 5 / PA
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / AMMANN, Beat
Via Portico Virunio, 1
CH-6850 Mendrisio / CH
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina
Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi
Via San Gottardo 15
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina
Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi, Via San Gottardo 15
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date00971655.613.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000IB01637
Priority number, dateUS1999045688308.12.1999         Original published format: US 456883
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0141957
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235659
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235659
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/00, A61C1/14
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG MIT FLIEHKRAFTSPANNUNG ZWISCHEN WERKZEUG UND WERKZEUGSPINDEL[2002/36]
English:SET CONSISTING OF A TOOL AND SPINDLE, WITH CLAMPING BY CENTRIFUGAL FORCE[2002/36]
French:ENSEMBLE AXE ET OUTIL A SERRAGE PAR FORCE CENTRIFUGE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2001National basic fee paid 
30.11.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/36]
03.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2003Fee for grant paid
01.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
TR17.09.2003
CY13.11.2003
IE13.11.2003
LU13.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
[2006/51]
Former [2005/03]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY13.11.2003
IE13.11.2003
LU13.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
Former [2005/02]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY13.11.2003
LU13.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
Former [2004/46]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY13.11.2003
LU13.11.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
Former [2004/41]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY13.11.2003
LU13.11.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
Former [2004/39]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY13.11.2003
LU13.11.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
Former [2004/36]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
CY13.11.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT29.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI17.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[AD]GB944283  (PAUL HOPF, et al) [AD] 1-3 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9509711  (WESTWIND AIR BEARINGS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 3, line 7 - line 14 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE8913854U  (GEBR. BRASSELER GMBH & CO.) [A] * the whole document *