Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1229991

EP1229991 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING AIR IN A COMPRESSED AIR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haldex Brake Products AB
P.O. Box 501
261 24 Landskrona / SE
[2002/33]
Inventor(s)01 / OLSSON, Mats
Almlundavägen 19
S-245 92 Staffanstorp / SE
02 / POGEN, Mats-Orjan
Ringblommevägen 4
S-261 24 Billeberga / SE
 [2002/33]
Representative(s)Petri, Stellan
Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/33]Petri, Stellan
Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date00971948.512.10.2000
[2002/33]
WO2000SE01974
Priority number, dateSE1999000369214.10.1999         Original published format: SE 9903692
[2002/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0126783
Date:19.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1229991
Date:14.08.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001
[2002/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1229991
Date:02.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/26, B60T17/00, // B01D46:00
[2002/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON LUFT IN EINER ANLAGE MIT KOMPRIMIERTER LUFT[2002/33]
English:A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING AIR IN A COMPRESSED AIR SYSTEM[2002/33]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EPURER L'AIR D'UN SYSTEME D'AIR COMPRIME[2002/33]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2002National basic fee paid 
20.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
18.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2003Fee for grant paid
21.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.07.2003
BE02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
CY12.10.2003
LU12.10.2003
ES13.10.2003
IE13.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
[2005/03]
Former [2005/02]AT02.07.2003
BE02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
CY12.10.2003
LU12.10.2003
ES13.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2004/46]AT02.07.2003
BE02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
CY12.10.2003
LU12.10.2003
ES13.10.2003
Former [2004/39]AT02.07.2003
BE02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
CY12.10.2003
LU12.10.2003
Former [2004/36]AT02.07.2003
BE02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
CY12.10.2003
Former [2004/29]AT02.07.2003
BE02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
DK02.10.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT02.07.2003
BE02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
Former [2004/22]AT02.07.2003
CH02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
LI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT02.07.2003
FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
GR02.10.2003
PT02.10.2003
Former [2004/13]FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
PT02.10.2003
Former [2004/12]FI02.07.2003
NL02.07.2003
Former [2004/10]NL02.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9947240  (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE], et al);
 [Y]EP0490632  (BOC GROUP INC [US]);
 [A]US5451248  (SADKOWSKI PIOTR J [GB], et al);
 [A]US3555787  (LUSTIG EDUARD M)