Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240016

EP1240016 - MULTILAYER FILM FOR PACKAGING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.12.2004  [2004/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464 Duncan
South Carolina 29334 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464
Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VADHAR, Parimal, M.
118 N. Cedarbluff Ct.
Greer, SC 29650 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Barlow, Roy James
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Barlow, Roy James
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date00972068.111.10.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US28053
Priority number, dateUS1999041599112.10.1999         Original published format: US 415991
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0126897
Date:19.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240016
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/32
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTFOLIE ZUM VERPACKEN EINES ARTIKELS[2002/38]
English:MULTILAYER FILM FOR PACKAGING ARTICLE[2002/38]
French:FILM MULTICOUCHE SERVANT A EMBALLER UN ARTICLE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2002National basic fee paid 
15.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
17.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/50]
05.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9822282  (CRYOVAC INC [US]) [DX] 1-26 * the whole document *