EP1315841 - PROCESS FOR THE METALLURGICAL TREATMENT OF MOLTEN STEEL IN A CONVERTER WITH OXYGEN TOP BLOWN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berry Metal Company 2408 Evans City Road Harmony, PA 16037-7799 / US | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELDHAUS, Bernd Heinkamp 8a D-47178 Duisburg / DE | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Allan, James Stewart Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Allan, James Stewart Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/23] | Allan, Jamie Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00972070.7 | 06.10.2000 | [2003/23] | WO2000US28077 | Priority number, date | DE1999148187 | 06.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19948187 | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/23] | DE1999148187 | 06.10.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0231212 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315841 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315841 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/32, C21D11/00 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
C21C7/068 (EP);
C21C5/30 (EP);
C21C5/4606 (EP);
C21C5/4673 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR METALLURGISCHEN BEHANDLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEM STAHL MIT SAUERSTOFF IN EINEM AUFBLASKONVERTER | [2003/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE METALLURGICAL TREATMENT OF MOLTEN STEEL IN A CONVERTER WITH OXYGEN TOP BLOWN | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT METALLURGIQUE D'ACIER EN FUSION DANS UN CONVERTISSEUR A SOUFFLAGE D'OXYGENE PAR LE HAUT | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2003 | Translation filed | 26.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 20.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 04.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2005 | BE | 27.04.2005 | CH | 27.04.2005 | ES | 27.04.2005 | FI | 27.04.2005 | FR | 27.04.2005 | IT | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2005 | DE | 28.07.2005 | CY | 06.10.2005 | GB | 06.10.2005 | IE | 06.10.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
IT | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
CY | 06.10.2005 | ||
GB | 06.10.2005 | ||
IE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
FR | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
IT | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
CY | 06.10.2005 | ||
GB | 06.10.2005 | ||
IE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
CY | 06.10.2005 | ||
GB | 06.10.2005 | ||
IE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
GB | 06.10.2005 | ||
IE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
IE | 06.10.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
SE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 27.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3574598 (KERN DAVID W, et al); | [Y]US4474361 (KANEMOTO MICHITAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US4732607 (SUGIMORI TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [X]JPH03197612 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) |