Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238293

EP1238293 - CONTACT LENS COATING SELECTION AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
24.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc.
7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100
Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / TURNER, David, C.
12159 Travertine Trail
Jacksonville, FL 32223 / US
02 / HEATON, John, C.
1863 Tierra Verde Drive
Atlantic Beach, FL 32233 / US
03 / VANDERLAAN, Douglas, G.
8114 Parkridge Circle South
Jacksonville, FL 32211 / US
04 / STEFFEN, Robert, B.
1158 Blue Heron Lane West
Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250 / US
05 / WOOD, Joe, M.
1888 Edgewood Avenue South
Jacksonville, FL 32205 / US
06 / COPPER, Lenora, L.
12306 Peach Orchard Drive
Jacksonville, FL 32223 / US
07 / JEN, James, S.
10052 Deercreek Club Road
Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Kirsch, Susan Edith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/12]
Former [2013/48]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2002/40]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date00972077.211.10.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US28092
Priority number, dateUS1999041719612.10.1999         Original published format: US 417196
US2000066343716.09.2000         Original published format: US 663437
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0127662
Date:19.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238293
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238293
Date:27.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/10, G02B1/04, C08J7/04
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:AUSWAHL EINER BESCHICHTUNG FÜR KONTAKTLINSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2002/37]
English:CONTACT LENS COATING SELECTION AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS[2002/37]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET DE SELECTION D'UN REVETEMENT DE LENTILLE DE CONTACT[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2002National basic fee paid 
10.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
08.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.01.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2013Fee for grant paid
16.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.08.2014  03.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Bausch, Thorsten
Daglfingerstr. 10b
81929 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/41]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2014  03.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Bausch, Thorsten
Daglfingerstr. 10b
81929 München / DE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
01.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1431/16
15.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2009Appeal received No.  T1179/09
15.05.2009Statement of grounds filed
11.10.2012Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
24.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
10.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP0963761  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [PX] 1 * claims 1-9 * * page 2, line 11 - line 18 * * page 2, line 47 - page 4, line 43 * * page 5; example 1 *;
 [X]EP0362137  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1 * claims 1-38 * * page 2, line 39 - line 45 * * page 3, line 14 - line 30 * * page 5, line 27 - line 36 *;
 [PA]WO9957178  (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [PA] 1 * claim 1 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]JPH0519103  ;
 [A]WO9300391  (BIOINTERACTIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1,5,31 *;
 [A]US5409731  (NAKAGAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * column 9; example 1 *;
 [A]WO9915917  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 1, paragraphs 4-6 * * page 6, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930603), vol. 017, no. 290, Database accession no. (P - 1549), & JP05019103 A 19930129 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS3228741
 US3341490