Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240149

EP1240149 - PROCESS TO PREPARE ARYLTRIAZOLINONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/38]PROCESS TO PREPARE ARYLTRIAZOLINONES AND NOVEL INTERMEDIATES THERETO
[2006/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FMC CORPORATION
1735 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / GOUDAR, Jaidev, S.
25-08 Fox Run Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Thom, Russell , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/42]Thom, Russell , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2005/40]Main, Malcolm Charles
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
Former [2002/38]Purdy, Hugh Barry
Murgitroyd & Company, Scotland House, 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date00972109.312.10.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US28240
Priority number, dateUS19990159247P13.10.1999         Original published format: US 159247 P
US2000066333618.09.2000         Original published format: US 663336
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0127092
Date:19.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1240149
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1240149
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D249/12, C07C257/22
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ARYLTRIAZOLINONEN[2006/06]
English:PROCESS TO PREPARE ARYLTRIAZOLINONES[2006/06]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ARYLTRIAZOLINONES[2006/06]
Former [2002/38]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ARYLTRIAZOLINONEN UND NEUE ZWISCHENPRODUKTE
Former [2002/38]PROCESS TO PREPARE ARYLTRIAZOLINONES AND NOVEL INTERMEDIATES THERETO
Former [2002/38]PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ARYLTRIAZOLINONES ET DE LEURS NOUVEAUX INTERMEDIAIRES
Entry into regional phase12.04.2002National basic fee paid 
12.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.03.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2005
06.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.12.2005Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2006Fee for grant paid
24.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04005348.0  / EP1440968
EP04005484.3
EP06017202.0   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 19.09.2006
Opposition(s)10.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/35]IT05.07.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8602642  (FMC CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,16-20 * page 9 - page 11; example 15 *;
 [A]EP0371438  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 11, line 49 - line 51 * * page 15, scheme 4 * * page 12, scheme 1 *;
 [X]US3819703  (HAMMANN I, et al) [X] 16 * claim 1; tables 1-3 * * column 2, line 26 - line 35 * * column 2, line 60 - line 65 *;
 [X]US3786094  (PERRONNET J, et al) [X] 16 * claim 1; examples, e.g. Ex. III; column 2, line 48 - line 54 *;
 [X]JPH0291062  (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO, et al) [X] 8-20 * page 5, column L, line 38 - column R, line 5; table 1 *;
 [A]US5449784  (GOUDAR JAIDEV S [US]) [A] 8-20 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US3870505  (KAUGARS GIRTS) [X] 16-20 * claim 1; examples *;
 [X]  - BARNISH I.T. ET AL., "Benzohydrazides, benzothiohydrazides, and benzamidrazones as sources of 1,3,4(2H)-oxdiazolinones, 1,3,4(2H)-thiadiazolinones, and 1,2,4(5H)-triazolinones", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY., HETEROCORPORATION. PROVO., US, (1986), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 417 - 419, XP000973131 [X] 1-7,16-20 * page 418, right-hand column, line 16 - line 22 and line 32 - line 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570230221
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Informationssysteme GmbH, Frankfurt, DE, XP002157109 [X] 16-18 * abstract *
    [] - JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE., VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH. WEINHEIM., DE, (1951), vol. 574, ISSN 0075-4617, pages 85 - 95,
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE, XP002157110 [X] 16-18 * abstract *
    [] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON., US, (1988), vol. 53, no. 18, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4349 - 4353,
 [X]  - DATABASE CHEMABS, Chemical Abstracts Service, Columbus, Ohio, US, XP002157111 [X] 16,17,19 * abstract *
    [] - PHARMAZIE, VEB VERLAG VOLK UND GESUNDHEIT. BERLIN., DD, (1993), vol. 48, no. 5, ISSN 0031-7144, pages 340 - 342,
 [X]  - TANAKA K ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF TRIFLUOROMETHYLTRIAZOLES FROM TRIFLUOROACETOHYDRAZONOYL BROMIDE 1", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY,HETEROCORPORATION. PROVO,US, (198709), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 1391 - 1396, XP000973401 [X] 8-20 * scheme 1;; page 1395, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570240532
 [X]  - FUSCO R ET AL, "Nuove sintesi di eterociclici. Nota 1. Triazoli e tiodiazoli", GAZZETTA CHIMICA ITALIANA., SOCIETA CHIMICA ITALIANA, ROME., IT, (1938), vol. 68, ISSN 0016-5603, pages 147 - 154, XP002165376 [X] 8-20 * page 149 * * page 154, paragraph 1 *
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE, XP002165377 [X] 16-18 * abstract *
    [] - AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY., (1998), vol. 51, no. 6, ISSN 0004-9425, pages 499 - 510,
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE, XP002165378 [X] 16-18 * abstract *
    [] - CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN., PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO., JP, (1988), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 800 - 802,
 [X]  - DATABASE CROSSFIRE, XP002165379 [X] 16,17,20 * abstract *
    [] - JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE., VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH. WEINHEIM., DE, (1955), vol. 591, ISSN 0075-4617, pages 200 - 230,
ExaminationUS5130310
 GB1603407