Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1222122

EP1222122 - COMBINATION PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Abt. RP, Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Abt. RP, Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NACHTSHEIM, Markus
Heinrich-Delp-Strasse 156
64297 Darmstadt / DE
02 / STEIGERWALD, Franz
Goethestrasse 8
64347 Griesheim / DE
 [2002/29]
Application number, filing date00972765.214.10.2000
[2002/29]
WO2000EP10132
Priority number, dateDE199915088422.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19950884
[2002/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0130665
Date:03.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1222122
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001
[2002/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1222122
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65D51/28, B65D81/32
[2002/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/26]
Former [2002/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSVERPACKUNG[2002/29]
English:COMBINATION PACKAGING[2002/29]
French:EMBALLAGE COMBINE[2002/29]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2002National basic fee paid 
26.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
30.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2003Fee for grant paid
28.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]DE8709336U  (MEIER ALEXANDER) [A] 1,3,6,7 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2590235  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,3,6 * page 8, paragraph 3; figures 2,3 *;
 [DA]DE19812153  (WELLA AG [DE]) [DA] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 55 - line 63; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2694542  (SCOPIC [FR]) [A] 2 * page 2, line 2; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US4221291  (HUNT GUILBERT M) [A] 4 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0770561  (REGGIANI FULVIO [IT]) [A] 5 * column 2, line 43 - line 45; figures 3,9 *
by applicantDE19812153