Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238053

EP1238053 - MOULDED FRAGRANCE BODIES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.06.2004  [2004/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / PAATZ, Kathleen
Kürnbergerstr. 105a
79650 Schopfheim / DE
02 / LAHN, Wolfgang
Steinstr. 112
47877 Willich / DE
03 / BLOCK, Christian
Wartburgplatz 12
50733 Köln / DE
04 / SCHAPER, Ulf-Armin
Randstrasse 18 a
47804 Krefeld / DE
 [2002/37]
Application number, filing date00972874.227.10.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000EP10579
Priority number, dateDE199915350306.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19953503
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0134751
Date:17.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238053
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/50, C11D17/00, C11D3/12, C11D3/22
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/37]
TitleGerman:DUFTSTOFF-FORMKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2002/37]
English:MOULDED FRAGRANCE BODIES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2002/37]
French:CORPS MOULES DE PARFUM ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2002National basic fee paid 
27.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.04.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
04.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/26]
16.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US4536315  (RAMACHANDRAN PALLASSANNA [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, lines 15-22 * * column 3, lines 13-44 * * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 10 * * column 7, lines 29-42 * * column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 47 * * column 10, lines 20-39; example -; claim - *;
 [DA]DE19746780  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DA] 1-18 * page 2, lines 3-7 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 64 * * page 6, line 45 - page 7, line 8; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US5955419  (BARKET JR DENNIS JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, lines 8-11 * * column 3, lines 8-16; example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9812291  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 1, lines 8-10 * * page 3, lines 4-7; example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9951715  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * example -; claim - *