Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235800

EP1235800 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMORPHOUS ATORVASTATIN CALCIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EGIS Gyógyszergyár Nyrt
1106 Budapest
Keresztúri út 30-38 / HU
[2006/42]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
EGIS GYOGYSZERGYAR
Kereszturi ut 30-38
H-1106 Budapest / HU
Inventor(s)01 / GREFF, Zoltán
Gyöngyvirág u. 8
H-1028 Budapest / HU
02 / KOTAY NAGY, Péter;
Nagymezö; u. 73
H-2600 Vác / HU
03 / BARKOCZY, Jozsef
Szirom u. 4-6/B
H-1016 Budapest / HU
04 / SIMIG, Gyula
Hollosy S. u. 25
H-1126 Budapest / HU
05 / BALAZS, László
Baross u. 38
H-1088 Budapest / HU
06 / DOMAN, Imre
Mohács u. 18/B
H-1035 Budapest / HU
07 / RATKAI, Zoltán
Monori u. 19
H-1101 Budapest / HU
08 / SERES, Péter
Rädda Barnen u. 6
H-1153 Budapest / HU
09 / SZENT KIRALLYI, Zsuzsa;
Tüzliliom u. 51
H-1223 Budapest / HU
10 / BARTHA, Ferenc
Kabay u. 3-5/5
H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU
11 / VERECZKEYNE DONATH, Györgyi
Lajos u. 49/b
H-1036 Budapest / HU
12 / NAGY, Kálmán
Turista u. 2/a
H-1025 Budapest / HU
 [2006/46]
Former [2002/36]01 / GREFF, Zoltán
Gyöngyvirág u. 8
H-1028 Budapest / HU
02 / KOTAY NAGY, Péter;
Nagymezö; u. 73
H-2600 Vác / HU
03 / BARKOCZY, Jozsef
Szirom u. 4-6/B
H-1016 Budapest / HU
04 / SIMIG, Gyula
Hollosy S. u. 25
H-1126 Budapest / HU
05 / BALAZS, Lászlo
Baross u. 38
H-1088 Budapest / HU
06 / DOMAN, Imre
Mohács u. 18/B
H-1035 Budapest / HU
07 / RATKAI, Zoltán
Monori u. 19
H-1101 Budapest / HU
08 / SERES, Péter
Rädda Barnen u. 6
H-1153 Budapest / HU
09 / SZENT KIRALLYI, Zsuzsa;
Tüzliliom u. 51
H-1223 Budapest / HU
10 / BARTHA, Ferenc
Kabay u. 3-5/5
H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU
11 / VERECZKEYNE DONATH, Györgyi
Lajos u. 49/b
H-1036 Budapest / HU
12 / NAGY, Kálmán
Turista u. 2/a
H-1025 Budapest / HU
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00973115.917.10.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000HU00106
Priority number, dateHU1999000363418.10.1999         Original published format: HU 9903634
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0128999
Date:26.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235800
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235800
Date:15.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D207/34
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesAL21.05.2002
LT21.05.2002
LV21.05.2002
MK21.05.2002
RO21.05.2002
SI21.05.2002
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMORPHEM ATORVASTATIN KALZIUM[2002/36]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMORPHOUS ATORVASTATIN CALCIUM[2002/36]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ATORVASTATINE CALCIQUE AMORPHE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase21.05.2002National basic fee paid 
21.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
08.07.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.04.2006
04.04.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2006Fee for grant paid
30.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2006
BE15.11.2006
CH15.11.2006
CY15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
IT15.11.2006
LI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
DK15.02.2007
SE15.02.2007
GR16.02.2007
ES26.02.2007
PT16.04.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2008/19]AT15.11.2006
BE15.11.2006
CH15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
IT15.11.2006
LI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
DK15.02.2007
SE15.02.2007
GR16.02.2007
ES26.02.2007
PT16.04.2007
Former [2007/39]AT15.11.2006
BE15.11.2006
CH15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
IT15.11.2006
LI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
DK15.02.2007
SE15.02.2007
ES26.02.2007
PT16.04.2007
Former [2007/37]AT15.11.2006
BE15.11.2006
CH15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
IT15.11.2006
LI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
DK15.02.2007
SE15.02.2007
PT16.04.2007
Former [2007/36]AT15.11.2006
BE15.11.2006
CH15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
IT15.11.2006
LI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
SE15.02.2007
PT16.04.2007
Former [2007/35]AT15.11.2006
BE15.11.2006
CH15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
IT15.11.2006
LI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
SE15.02.2007
Former [2007/30]AT15.11.2006
BE15.11.2006
CH15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
LI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
SE15.02.2007
Former [2007/28]AT15.11.2006
FI15.11.2006
NL15.11.2006
SE15.02.2007
Former [2007/25]FI15.11.2006
SE15.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[XD]US5273995  (ROTH BRUCE D [US]) [XD] 1-4 * column 15, line 52 - line 55; example 10 *;
 [AD]WO9703960  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-4 * page 2, line 26 - line 30; example 2; claim 1 *