EP1242073 - COMPOSITIONS FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF COLD AND INFLUENZA-LIKE SYMPTOMS AND THEIR METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENNIE, Paul John Ataraxia, Ballfield Road Godalming, Surrey GU7 2HA / GB | 02 /
KING, Simon, Phillip 67 Heath Road Weybridge KT13 8TJ / GB | 03 /
BIEDERMANN, Kimberly, Ann 20 Trailbridge Drive Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 04 /
MORGAN, Jeffrey, Michael 8575 Highmount Drive Springboro, OH 45066 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2002/39] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble H&BC Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00973658.8 | 19.10.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US28856 | Priority number, date | US19990421131 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 421131 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0128556 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1242073 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242073 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4015, // (A61K31/4015, 33:30, 33:24, 31:375, 31:194), A61K31:19 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
A61Q17/005 (EP);
A61K31/195 (KR);
A61K31/28 (EP);
A61K8/0208 (EP);
A61K8/4913 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/28, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG DER ERKÄLTUNG UND GRIPPE-ARTIGER SYMPTOME UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2002/39] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF COLD AND INFLUENZA-LIKE SYMPTOMS AND THEIR METHODS OF USE | [2002/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DESTINEES A LA PREVENTION ET AU TRAITEMENT DU RHUME ET DES SYMPTOMES DE TYPE GRIPPAL ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERES | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 23.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | BE | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | CY | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | IE | 19.10.2004 | LU | 19.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
CY | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 19.10.2004 | ||
LU | 19.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 19.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4444885 (NAKANISHI TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * example 2 *; | [X]DE3431727 (ROBUGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 5, line 8 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, example *; | [AD]US4767788 (DIANA GUY D [US]) [AD] 1-3,7 * column 1, line 14 - column 1, line 16 ** column 3, line 6 - column 3, line 9 *; | [A]EP0371421 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 6 * page 2, line 21 - page 2, line 26 * * page 2, line 48 - page 2, line 53 *; | [X]EP0408330 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE]) [X] 1,3,5 * page 11, "nasal drops" *; | [X]US5508282 (TULIN-SILVER JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 17 * * table III *; | [X]EP0856316 (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,5 * examples 5,12,14 * |