Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1224806

EP1224806 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECORDING PUSHED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OpenTV, Corp.
401 East Middlefield Road
Mountain View, CA 94043-4005 / US
[2002/30]
Inventor(s)01 / PIERRE, Ludovic
1210 Dolores Street, 3
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
02 / DUREAU, Vincent
3519 South Court
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
03 / DELPUCH, Alain
34 Parc Des Essarts
F-78690 Les Essarts / FR
 [2002/30]
Representative(s)Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2002/30]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date00974109.115.09.2000
[2002/30]
WO2000US40909
Priority number, dateUS19990162490P29.10.1999         Original published format: US 162490 P
[2002/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0133852
Date:10.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1224806
Date:24.07.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001
[2002/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1224806
Date:19.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16
[2002/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME VON PUSH DATEN[2002/30]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECORDING PUSHED DATA[2002/30]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES POUSSEES[2002/30]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2002National basic fee paid 
08.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/30]
10.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2003Fee for grant paid
08.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.11.2003
BE19.11.2003
CY19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
PT19.04.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]AT19.11.2003
BE19.11.2003
CY19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
Former [2004/52]AT19.11.2003
BE19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
Former [2004/31]AT19.11.2003
FI19.11.2003
Former [2004/26]FI19.11.2003
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US5797001  (AUGENBRAUN JOSEPH ELLIS ET AL) [X] 1,4-7,9,11,12,15-17,20,22 * column 6, line 9 - line 21 * * column 8, line 43 - line 47 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 13,14;
 [XA]WO9836559  (UNIV COLUMBIA ;KALVA HARI (US); ELEFTHERIADIS ALEXANDROS (US)) [X] 5-7,9,11,12,15-17,20 * page 4, line 5 - line 11 * * page 5, line 11 - line 17 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 1 * * page 12, line 10 - line 25 * [A] 1;
 [X]EP0913974  (SOHARD AG) [X] 5,9,12 * paragraph [0004] * * column 6, line 42 - line 49 * * column 8, line 12 - line 24 * * paragraph [0036] *;
 [Y]EP0949816  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS) [Y] 13,14 * paragraph [0006] *