blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1230230

EP1230230 - INDENO-DIHYDROTHIAZOLE DERIVATIVES, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS ANORECTIC MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/33]INDENO-, NAPHTHO-, AND BENZOCYCLOHEPTA-DIHYDROTHIAZOLE DERIVATIVES, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS ANORECTIC MEDICAMENTS
[2003/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2002/33]
Inventor(s)01 / JAEHNE, Gerhard
Seebachstrasse 22
65929 Frankfurt / DE
02 / GOSSEL, Matthias
Im Lorsbachtal 17a
65719 Hofheim / DE
03 / LANG, Hans-Jochen
Rüdesheimer Strasse 7
65719 Hofheim / DE
04 / BICKEL, Martin
Mittelstedter Weg 3
61348 Bad Homburg / DE
 [2002/33]
Application number, filing date00974437.621.10.2000
[2002/33]
WO2000EP10396
Priority number, dateDE199915320505.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19953205
DE200011330617.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10013306
[2002/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0132638
Date:10.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1230230
Date:14.08.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1230230
Date:17.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2001
ClassificationIPC:C07D277/60, A61K31/425, A61P3/04, A61P3/10
[2002/33]
CPC:
C07D277/60 (EP,US); A61K31/425 (EP,US); A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP); A61P3/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/33]
Extension statesAL05.06.2002
LT05.06.2002
LV05.06.2002
MK05.06.2002
RO05.06.2002
SI05.06.2002
TitleGerman:INDENO-DIHYDROTHIAZOL DERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ANOREKTISCHE ARZNEIMITTEL[2003/14]
English:INDENO-DIHYDROTHIAZOLE DERIVATIVES, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS ANORECTIC MEDICAMENTS[2003/14]
French:DERIVES D'INDENO-DIHYDROTHIAZOL, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS ANOREXIGENES[2003/14]
Former [2002/33]INDENO-, NAPHTHO- UND BENZOCYCLOHEPTA-DIHYDROTHIAZOL DERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ANOREKTISCHE ARZNEIMITTEL
Former [2002/33]INDENO-, NAPHTHO-, AND BENZOCYCLOHEPTA-DIHYDROTHIAZOLE DERIVATIVES, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS ANORECTIC MEDICAMENTS
Former [2002/33]DERIVES D'INDENO-, NAPHTO- ET BENCYCLOHEPTA-DIHYDROTHIAZOL, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS ANOREXIGENES
Entry into regional phase05.06.2002National basic fee paid 
05.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
12.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2003Fee for grant paid
21.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.10.2003
[2005/02]
Cited inInternational search[A]US3507868  (MANNING ROBERT E) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2640358  (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO0004006  (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL DE GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO0018749  (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1-3,6-14 *;
 [PA]WO0051994  (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-14* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.