EP1237460 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR A WASHING-SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Getinge Disinfection AB Box 1505 351 80 Växjö / SE | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄKANSSON, Paul Diskusvägen 5 S-352 51 Växjö / SE | 02 /
KARLSSON, Roland Morgonvägen 10 S-352 61 Växjö / SE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Lind, Urban, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00975110.8 | 27.10.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000SE02094 | Priority number, date | SE19990004054 | 09.11.1999 Original published format: SE 9904054 | [2002/37] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134015 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1237460 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1237460 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/36 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
A47L15/241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE WASCHANLAGE | [2002/37] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR A WASHING-SYSTEM | [2002/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DESTINES A UN SYSTEME DE LAVAGE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2001 | Translation filed | 22.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | BE | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | IE | 27.10.2006 | LU | 27.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
LU | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
LI | 06.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04193152 ; | [A]US4357176 (ANTHONY JOHN A); | [A]DE4113086 (STIERLEN MAQUET AG [DE]); | [A]US5329952 (KOJIMA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]DE19513994 (MIELE & CIE [DE]); | [A]DE19629325 (NICOLAUS NORBERT DIPL ING [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP04193152 A 19920713 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |