Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238561

EP1238561 - FOUR-FIBER RING OPTICAL CROSS-CONNECT SYSTEM USING 4X4 SWITCH MATRICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.10.2006  [2006/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
CORNING INCORPORATED
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Ming-Jun
10 Ambrose Drive
Horseheads, NY 14845 / US
02 / SOULLIERE, Mark, J.
276 Wall Street
Corning, NY 14830 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Boon, Graham Anthony , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Boon, Graham Anthony , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date00975344.323.10.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US29259
Priority number, dateUS1999046506616.12.1999         Original published format: US 465066
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0145451
Date:21.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238561
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/00, H04J14/02, H04B10/00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VIERFASERRING OPTISCHES QUERVERBINDUNGSSYSTEM MIT 4X4 SCHALTMATRIZEN[2002/37]
English:FOUR-FIBER RING OPTICAL CROSS-CONNECT SYSTEM USING 4X4 SWITCH MATRICES[2002/37]
French:SYSTEME ANNULAIRE D'INTERCONNEXION OPTIQUE A QUATRE FIBRES A 4X4 MATRICES DE COMMUTATION[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2002National basic fee paid 
03.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
03.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/42]
02.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9825365  (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [X] 1,17,21 * abstract * * page 8, lines 13-23 * * page 16, lines 6-19 * * page 27, lines 1-6 *;
 [A]  - ELREFAIE A F, "MULTIWAVELENGTH SURVIVABLE RING NETWORK ARCHITECTURES", GENEVA, MAY 23 - 26, 1993,NEW YORK, IEEE,US, (19930523), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0950-2, pages 1245 - 1251, XP000371271 [A] 1-26 * figure 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397474
 [A]  - FUJIMOTO N ET AL, "BROADBAND SUBSCRIBER LOOP SYSTEM USING MULTI-GIGABIT INTELLIGENT OPTICAL SHUTTLE NODES", TOKYO, NOV. 15 - 18, 1987,NEW YORK, IEEE,US, (19871115), vol. -, pages 1449 - 1454, XP000093518 [A] 1-26 * figure 8 *