Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235864

EP1235864 - NO-RUB FINISHING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valspar Sourcing, Inc.
901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461
Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Valspar Sourcing, Inc.
1101 Third Street South
Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Frank, Bor-Her
5613 Boxborough Court
Greensboro, NC 27407 / US
02 / MUSELMAN, Gregory, David
1810 Millhouse Court
Greensboro, NC 27407 / US
03 / SAFTA, Eugen
2461 West Clemmonsville Road
Winston Salem, NC 27127 / US
04 / FORREST, Harvey, Richard
17782 Center Church Road
Lexington, NC 27295 / US
05 / MATTON, George
3902 Cole Avenue
High Point, NC 27265 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2002/36]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date00975438.327.10.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US29666
Priority number, dateUS19990161804P27.10.1999         Original published format: US 161804 P
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0130857
Date:03.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235864
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235864
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.05.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/48, C09D101/18, C09D101/32, C09D133/06, C09D163/00, C09D167/00, C09D175/04, C09G1/16
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
TitleGerman:REIBFREIER DECKLACK[2002/36]
English:NO-RUB FINISHING COMPOSITIONS[2002/36]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE FINITION SANS PON AGE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2002National basic fee paid 
03.05.2002Search fee paid 
03.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
06.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2005Fee for grant paid
27.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
CY27.10.2005
IE27.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
[2007/20]
Former [2007/08]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
IE27.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/48]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
IE27.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/30]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/26]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/25]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/14]AT03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
SE03.11.2005
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4251597  (EMMONS WILLIAM D, et al);
 [Y]US5994424  (SAFTA EUGEN [US], et al);
 [X]US4544623  (AUDYKOWSKI THADDEUS [CH], et al);
 [A]US5750186  (FRAZZITTA JOSEPH [US]);
 [A]US4360541  (COSTANZA JOHN R, et al);
 [Y]US5985951  (COOK PHILLIP MICHAEL [US]);
 [X]US4654233  (GRANT RICHARD J [US], et al)