Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235771

EP1235771 - PROCESS FOR VINYL CHLORIDE MANUFACTURE FROM ETHANE AND ETHYLENE WITH IMMEDIATE HCL RECOVERY FROM REACTOR EFFLUENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/30]For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street, 1790 Building
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies, Inc.
Washington Street, 1790 Building
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HICKMAN, Daniel, A.
2010 Westbury Drive
Midland, MI 48642 / US
02 / HENLEY, John, P.
5900 Schade Drive
Midland, MI 48640 / US
03 / JONES, Mark, E.
3856 Ken's Lane
Midland, MI 48642 / US
04 / MARSHALL, Kenric, A.
67 North Callalily Court
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
05 / REED, Daniel, J.
9 La Paloma Court
Angleton, TX 77515 / US
06 / CLARKE, William, D.
Box 894
Brazoria, TX 77422 / US
07 / OLKEN, Michael, M.
2700 Mount Vernon Drive
Midland, MI 48642 / US
08 / WALKO, Lee, E.
809 Honeysuckle Circle
Midland, MI 48642 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/50]Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2002/36]Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr. , et al
Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date00976556.106.10.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US27700
Priority number, dateUS19990166897P22.11.1999         Original published format: US 166897 P
WO2000US2727203.10.2000         Original published format: PCT/US00/27272
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0142176
Date:14.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235771
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235771
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/154, C07C17/156, C07C17/152, C07C21/06
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VINYLCHLORID AUS ETHAN UND ETHYLEN MIT SOFORTIGER GEWINNUNG VON HCL AUS REAKTIONSSTRÖMEN[2002/36]
English:PROCESS FOR VINYL CHLORIDE MANUFACTURE FROM ETHANE AND ETHYLENE WITH IMMEDIATE HCL RECOVERY FROM REACTOR EFFLUENT[2002/36]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE A PARTIR DE L'ETHANE ET DE L'ETHYLENE AVEC RECUPERATION IMMEDIATE DE HCl DE L'EFFLUENT DU REACTEUR[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2002National basic fee paid 
24.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
31.07.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2005Fee for grant paid
29.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
CY08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
FR08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
GB06.10.2006
IE06.10.2006
LU06.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/36]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
GB06.10.2006
IE06.10.2006
LU06.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2008/19]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
GR09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
GB06.10.2006
IE06.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2007/50]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
GB06.10.2006
IE06.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2007/48]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
IE06.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2007/37]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2007/35]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/14]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
DE09.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/13]AT08.02.2006
BE08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/09]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
PT10.07.2006
Former [2007/08]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
ES19.05.2006
Former [2006/51]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
DK08.05.2006
SE08.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
NL08.02.2006
SE08.05.2006
Former [2006/43]AT08.02.2006
CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
Former [2006/42]CH08.02.2006
FI08.02.2006
LI08.02.2006
Former [2006/36]FI08.02.2006
Cited inInternational search[DY]BE667111  (PRINCETON CHEMICAL RESEARCH INC) [DY] 1-4,34,58 * claims 1,8-10 *;
 [Y]GB1475358  (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-4,34,58 * page 2, column 2, line 116 - line 121; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US4042640  (TSAO UTAH) [Y] 1-4,34,58 * column 3; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3488398  (HARPRING JEROME W, et al) [Y] 1-4,34,58 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US3968200  (TSAO UTAH) [Y] 1-4,34,58 * column 5, line 35 - line 37; claim 1 *