Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240480

EP1240480 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING SOAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.12.2016  [2016/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technical Concepts International Limited
Neutralle Centre Pin Green Buisiness Park Eastman Way
Stevenage, Herts. SG1 4UH / GB
[2003/18]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
TECHNICAL CONCEPTS, L.P.
1301 Allanson Road
Mundelein, IL 60060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MUDERLAK, Kenneth, J.
4481 N. Maryland Avenue
Shorewood, WI 53211 / US
02 / SHIEH, Rocky
2F, 43 Guang Hua S. Street
Hsin Chu / TW
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2003/18]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Eastcheap House Central Approach
Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB
Former [2002/38]Newstead, Michael John , et al
Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead
Bristol BS1 2NT / GB
Application number, filing date00977287.229.09.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000US41032
Priority number, dateUS19990156987P01.10.1999         Original published format: US 156987 P
US2000052597615.03.2000         Original published format: US 525976
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0125730
Date:12.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240480
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.04.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:A47K5/12
[2006/14]
Former International [2002/38]G01F11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/38]
Extension statesAL29.04.2002
LT29.04.2002
LV29.04.2002
MK29.04.2002
RO29.04.2002
SI29.04.2002
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSGEBEN VON SEIFE[2002/38]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING SOAP[2002/38]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DE SAVON[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2002National basic fee paid 
25.04.2002Search fee paid 
25.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.05.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
05.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/51]
16.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
22.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[DXA]US4938384  (PILOLLA JOSEPH J [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,6,7,13,14,19,31,56 * column 2, line 60 - column 7, line 35; figure 1 * [A] 15,36,61;
 [XA]WO9735780  (GEBRO BROSCHEK GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,6,19 * the whole document * [A] 31,56;
 [XA]DE8902701U  (SHIAU, GUEY-CHUAN, KEELUNG, TW) [X] 1,4,28,29 * the whole document * [A] 19,30,31,56,61;
 [X]US5615806  (GROTHOFF HANS [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US5632414  (MERRIWEATHER JR FRANK [US]) [X] 6,19 * the whole document * [A] 1,15,31,56,61;
 [X]US4280638  (KEIHM NEIL W) [X] 1,2,19-21 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,7 *;
 [XA]GB2085531  (ROWBOTHAM KENNETH RICHARD) [X] 6 * the whole document * [A] 1,19,31,56
International search[X]US4938384  (PILOLLA JOSEPH J [US], et al);
 [A]US5632414  (MERRIWEATHER JR FRANK [US]);
 [A]US5226566  (BRANDENBURG ALLEN E [US]);
 [A]US5476197  (LAWRENCE ANDREW M [US], et al)
by applicantUS156987
 US4967935
 US4938384
 US4921150
 US4722372
 US4645094