Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235668

EP1235668 - CHAMFER DEVICE FOR CUTTING PACKAGING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohrer AG
Bremenstallstrasse 1
4313 Möhlin / CH
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / ROHRER, Hans-Peter
Bremenstallstrasse 1
CH-4313 Möhlin / CH
02 / ZUMSTEG, Heinz
Grieshaldenweg 5
CH-4314 Zeiningen / CH
03 / RAGGENBASS, Alfred
Gumpenwiesenstrasse 4
CH-8157 Dielsdorf / CH
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Bollhalder, Renato
Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Bollhalder, Renato
A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date00977338.306.12.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000CH00646
Priority number, dateCH1999000228010.12.1999         Original published format: CH 228099
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0141984
Date:14.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235668
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235668
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B26D7/26, B26F1/40, B26D3/08, B26D5/04
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KERBSCHNITTVORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON VERPACKUNGSMATERIALIEN[2002/36]
English:CHAMFER DEVICE FOR CUTTING PACKAGING MATERIALS[2002/36]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTAILLAGE SERVANT A COUPER DES MATERIAUX D'EMBALLAGE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2002National basic fee paid 
01.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
07.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2003Fee for grant paid
10.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
TR03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
TR03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2006/51]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
TR03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/18]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/05]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/03]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US2663180  (BENEDICT LEONARD E) [X] 1,2,9,10,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4905558  (CORCORAN SEAN [IE]) [X] 1,4,9,10 * column 4, line 5 - line 13; figure - *;
 [X]US5671589  (IRVINE GERALD O [US], et al) [X] 1,3,9,10 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 3 *;
 [X]CH447461  (UNITED SHOE MACHINERY CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0655303  (LANDE WELLPAPPEN AG [CH]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0615910  (WACHSMUTH & CO WERKZEUGBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 6 - column 7, line 17 *;
 [A]DE4311092  (R A T SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 30 - column 52; figure - *;
 [A]US4273738  (SPENGLER ERNST M) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 3 *;
 [A]DE19521604  (WACHSMUTH & CO WERKZEUGBAU [DE])