Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242821

EP1242821 - DIRECT SCREENING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2008
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Domantis Limited
980 Great West Road Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2008/04]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Domantis Limited
315 Cambridge Science Park
Cambridge Cambridgeshire, CB4 OWG / GB
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
Domantis Limited
Granta Park, Abington
Cambridge, CB1 6GS / GB
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Domantis Limited
20 Park Crescent
London W1N 4AL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HOLT, Lucy Jessica
9b Anstey Way
Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 2JE / GB
02 / DE WILDT, Rudolf, Maria, Theodora
21 Kelvin Close
Cambridge CB1 8DN / GB
03 / TOMLINSON, Ian
13 Tunwells Lane
Great Shelford Cambridge CB2 5LJ / GB
 [2003/12]
Former [2002/39]01 / HOLT, Lucy Jessica
9b Anstey Way
Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 2JE / GB
02 / DE WILDT, Rudolf, Maria, Theodora
27 Grange Road
Cambridge CB3 9AU / GB
03 / TOMLINSON, Ian
13 Tunwells Lane
Great Shelford Cambridge CB2 5LJ / GB
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2008/24]Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2002/39]Maschio, Antonio
D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00977784.804.12.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000GB04638
Priority number, dateGB1999002878703.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9928787
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0140803
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242821
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242821
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1242821
Date:28.05.2008
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2008/13]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIREKTES SCREENINGVERFAHREN[2002/39]
English:DIRECT SCREENING METHOD[2002/39]
French:PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE DIRECT[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2002National basic fee paid 
26.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
06.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2008Fee for grant paid
03.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08000334.6  / EP2000804
Opposition(s)21.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
10.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
TR20.02.2008
GR21.05.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]CY20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
TR20.02.2008
Former [2009/33]CY20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
Former [2008/39]FI20.02.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9939210  (MILLER SAMUEL [AU], et al) [X] 27-29 * page 22, line 1 - line 20 * * page 32, line 19 - page 34, paragraph 1 * * page 36, line 24 - page 37, line 9; claims 58,60 *;
 [X]WO9941383  (MAXYGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-10,14-17,19,25,26 * page 53, line 23 - page 54, line 16 * * page 72, line 24 - page 73, line 10 *;
 [PX]  - DE WILDT RUUD M T ET AL, "Antibody arrays for high-throughput screening of antibody-antigen interactions", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY,NATURE PUBLISHING,US, (200009), vol. 18, no. 9, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 989 - 994, XP002162316 [PX] 1-29 * abstract * * page 992, column L, paragraph L - page 993, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/79494
 [A]  - HOOGENBOOM H R ET AL, "Antibody phage display technology and its applications", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, (19980601), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 1 - 20, XP004127382 [A] 1-29 * page 13, column R, paragraph L - page 16, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(98)00007-4