Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235801

EP1235801 - SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.12.2004
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.02.2005  [2005/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8524 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Dainippon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8524 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IWATA, Motokazu
27-26, Teratani-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1024 / JP
02 / KURIYAMA, Teruaki
10-40-904, Shimorokumanji-cho 1-chome
Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 579-8066 / JP
03 / FUJITA, Megumi
2-13, Aoyama 4-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2101 / JP
04 / FUJIWARA, Keiichi 216, Suncity-Katsurazaka-Royal
Sanbankan 5-3, Oekitakutsukake-cho 1-chome
Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 610-1101 / JP
05 / KATO, Shiro
6-18, Ebaraji-cho 2-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka 593-8304 / JP
06 / HARADA, Hiroshi
8-25-703, Minamikaneden 1-chome
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0044 / JP
07 / FUJII, Akihito
6-20, Mayumiminami 1-chome
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0123 / JP
08 / ODAI, Osamu
15-8, Toda-cho
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0045 / JP
09 / KAWASHIMA, Hitoshi
5-10-708, Tomobuchi-cho 1-chome
Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 534-0016 / JP
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Coleiro, Raymond , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Coleiro, Raymond , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date00977904.224.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000JP08283
Priority number, dateJP1999033954730.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33954799
US2000066157714.09.2000         Original published format: US 661577
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0140182
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1235801
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/16, A61K31/404, A61P3/04
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LT27.06.2002
LV27.06.2002
MKNot yet paid
RO27.06.2002
SI27.06.2002
TitleGerman:FESTE ARZNEIZUBEREITUNG[2002/36]
English:SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION[2002/36]
French:PREPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE SOLIDE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2002National basic fee paid 
27.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
14.12.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational searchJPH11255743  [ ] (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [DA]EP0801059  (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1,16,17 * page 25, line 34 - line 35; example 4 *
 [A]  - KATO,SHIRO ET AL., "Preparation of optically active indoles and their intermediates as antidiabetics and antiobesity agents.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19991025), vol. 131, no. 17, Database accession no. 228647a, XP002169913 [A] 1,16,17 * abstract *