Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241527

EP1241527 - POSITIVE TYPE PHOTOSENSITIVE POLYIMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2006  [2006/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd.
7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd.
7-1, Kandanishiki-cho 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHII, Kazuhisa, Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd.
Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho
Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8507 / JP
02 / NAKAYAMA, Tomonari Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd
Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho
Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8507 / JP
03 / NIHIRA, Takayasu, Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd.
Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho
Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8507 / JP
04 / FUKURO, Hiroyoshi Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd.
Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho
Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8507 / JP
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Hartz, Nikolai , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr. , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date00977917.424.11.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000JP08296
Priority number, dateJP1999033951830.11.1999         Original published format: JP 33951899
[2002/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0140873
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241527
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.06.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/00, C08K5/28, C08L79/08
[2003/03]
Former International [2002/38]G03F7/023, G03F7/038, C08L79/08, C08K5/28, H01L21/027
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/22]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:POSITIV ARBEITENDE PHOTOEMPFINDLICHE POLYIMIDHARZ-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2002/38]
English:POSITIVE TYPE PHOTOSENSITIVE POLYIMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION[2002/38]
French:COMPOSITION DE RESINE DE POLYIMIDE PHOTOSENSIBLE DE TYPE POSITIF[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2002Translation filed 
29.05.2002National basic fee paid 
29.05.2002Search fee paid 
29.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
29.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/37]
25.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0863436  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,2,17,20 * * page 11, line 57 - page 12, line 2 *;
 [X]JPH04284455  ;
 [X]EP0424940  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * examples 1-8 *;
 [X]JPH04204738  ;
 [X]US4927736  (MUELLER WERNER H [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * examples 9-12 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930219), vol. 017, no. 084, Database accession no. (P - 1490), & JP04284455 A 19921009 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921110), vol. 016, no. 540, Database accession no. (P - 1450), & JP04204738 A 19920727 (NISSAN CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH1184653  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [X]JPH04284455  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH03209478  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD);
 [Y]JPH04204738  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD)