Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316321

EP1316321 - BASE MATERIALS FOR TISSUE REGENERATION, TRANSPLANT MATERIALS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Tissue Engineering Co., Ltd.
209-1, Miyakitadori 6-chome Gamagori-shi
Aichi 443-0022 / JP
For all designated states
Yui, Nobuhiko
4-103, Matsugaoka, Tatsunokuchi-cho Nomi-gun
Ishikawa-ken 923-1225 / JP
[2007/33]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Japan Tissue Engineering Co., Ltd.
209-1, Miyakitadori 6-chome
Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0022 / JP
For all designated states
Yui, Nobuhiko
4-103, Matsugaoka, Tatsunokuchi-cho
Nomi-gun, Ishikawa-ken 923-1225 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YUI, Nobuhiko
4-103, Matsugaoka, Tatsunokuchi-cho
Nomi-gun, Ishikawa-ken 923-1225 / JP
02 / OOYA, Tooru
Ta 108-1, Akarajima-machi, Tsurugi-cho
Ishikawa-gun, Ishikawa 920-2123 / JP
03 / KATO, Masakazu, c/o Japan Tissue Eng. Co., Ltd.
209-1, Miyakitadori 6-chome
Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0022 / JP
04 / YAMAMOTO, Takeyuki c/o Japan Tissue Eng. CO., Ltd
209-1, Miyakitadori 6-chome
Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0022 / JP
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Kuhnen, Rainer-Andreas
Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Fresing / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Kuhnen, Rainer Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date00977962.027.11.2000
[2003/23]
WO2000JP08350
Priority number, dateJP2000020134503.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000201345
JP2000020134603.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000201346
[2003/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0202159
Date:10.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316321
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316321
Date:15.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.01.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/14, A61L27/18, A61L27/38, A61L27/52, C12N5/00, C12N5/06
[2006/51]
Former International [2005/24]A61L27/18, A61L27/52, C12N5/06, C12N5/00, A61L27/14, A61L27/38
Former International [2003/23]A61L27/18, A61L27/52, C12M3/00, C12N5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BASISMATERIALIEN ZUR GEWEBEREGENERATION, TRANSPLANTATMATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SELBIGER[2003/23]
English:BASE MATERIALS FOR TISSUE REGENERATION, TRANSPLANT MATERIALS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2003/23]
French:MATERIAUX DE BASE POUR REGENERATION DE TISSUS, MATERIAUX DE TRANSPLANTATION, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2003Translation filed 
20.03.2003National basic fee paid 
20.03.2003Search fee paid 
20.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
20.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
15.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2007Fee for grant paid
17.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.03.2003DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2003
20.03.2003FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2003
20.03.2003GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2003
20.03.2003IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2003
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.03.2003M01   Fee paid on   20.03.2003
Additional fee for renewal fee
03.02.200303   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]  - HARADA A, "Construction of supramolecular structures from cyclodextrins and polymers", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (19971220), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 183 - 188, XP004101336 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(97)00023-4
 [X]  - WATANABE J ET AL, "Effect of acetylation of biodegradable polyrotaxanes on its supramolecular dissociation via terminal ester hydrolysis", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE. POLYMER EDITION, VSP, UTRECHT, NL, (1999), vol. 10, no. 12, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 1275 - 1288, XP002969569 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - YUI N ET AL, "EFFECT OF BIODEGRADABLE POLYROTAXANES ON PLATELET ACTIVATION", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 118 - 125, XP000729237 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc970189c
 [X]  - OOYA T ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of biodegradable polyrotaxane as a novel supramolecular-structured drug carrier", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE. POLYMER EDITION, VSP, UTRECHT, NL, (1997), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 437 - 455, XP002096596 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - OOYA TOORU ET AL, "Polyrotaxanes: Synthesis, structure, and potential in drug delivery", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1999), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0743-4863, page 289, XP009045544 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - OOYA T ET AL, "Biodegradable polyrotaxanes as a drug carrier", S.T.P. PHARMA SCIENCES 1999 FRANCE, (1999), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1157-1489, pages 129 - 138, XP009045547 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - WATANABE J ET AL, "Feasibility study of hydrolyzable polyrotaxanes aiming at implantable materials", JOURNAL OF ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, SPRINGER VERLAG, TOKYO, JP, (2000), vol. 3, ISSN 1434-7229, pages 136 - 142, XP002969568 [PX] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[X]JPH11319069  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP);
 [A]US6037387  (YUI NOBUHIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH09301893  (KAGAKU GIJUTSU SHINKO JIGYODAN);
 [A]JPH09263547  (YUI NOBUHIKO);
 [A]WO9609073  (YUI NOBUHIKO [JP])
 [X]  - JUNJI WATANABE ET AL., "Soshiki kougaku wo mezashita seibunkai-sei polyrotaxane no sekkei", KOUBUNSHI KAKOU, (19990525), vol. 48, no. 5, pages 209 - 215, XP002936790