Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258917

EP1258917 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING OXIDATION ON SUBSTRATE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJII, Toshiaki
8-3, Tsukimino 8-chome
Yamato-shi, Kanagawa 242-0002 / JP
02 / YOKOYAMA, Shin
3-8, Takayatakamigaoka 4-chome
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 739-2115 / JP
03 / YOSHINO, Takenobu
2, Saijochojike 7067
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 739-0041 / JP
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2002/47]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00978004.029.11.2000
[2002/47]
WO2000JP08419
Priority number, dateJP1999037508628.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37508699
[2002/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0148813
Date:05.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258917
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/68, B65D85/90
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/20]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER OXIDATION AUF SUBSTRATOBERFLÄCHEN[2002/47]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING OXIDATION ON SUBSTRATE SURFACE[2002/47]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUVANT EMPECHER L'OXYDATION A LA SURFACE D'UN SUBSTRAT[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2002Translation filed 
08.07.2002National basic fee paid 
08.07.2002Search fee paid 
08.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
23.04.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS60167414  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES);
 [Y]JPH08148551  (U M S KK, et al);
 [Y]JPH11217119  (EBARA CORP, et al);
 [Y]JPH0629373  (EBARA RES CO LTD);
 [A]JPH09162274  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JPS6328046  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD)