Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237960

EP1237960 - IRON-BASED CATALYST FOR PRODUCING OLIGOMERS OF CONJUGATED DIENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.09.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
For all designated states
Luo, Steven
915 Mull Avenue, Apartment PH-15
Akron, OH 44313 / US
For all designated states
Hilton, Ashley
7431 Shadyview Common
Massillon, OH 44646 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
For all designated states
Luo, Steven
915 Mull Avenue, Apartment PH-15
Akron, OH 44313 / US
For all designated states
Hilton, Ashley
7431 Shadyview Common
Massillon, OH 44646 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LUO, Steven
915 Mull Avenue, Apartment PH-15
Akron, OH 44313 / US
02 / HILTON, Ashley
7431 Shadyview Common
Massillon, OH 44646 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2002/37]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr.
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date00978386.103.11.2000
[2002/37]
WO2000US30498
Priority number, dateUS1999043462705.11.1999         Original published format: US 434627
US1999043466905.11.1999         Original published format: US 434669
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0132724
Date:10.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237960
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08F36/04, C08F4/70
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/20]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOR AUS EISEN BASIS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KONJUGIERTEN DIEN-OLIGOMERE[2002/37]
English:IRON-BASED CATALYST FOR PRODUCING OLIGOMERS OF CONJUGATED DIENES[2002/37]
French:CATALYSEUR A BASE DE FER POUR LA PRODUCTION D'OLIGOMERES DE DIENES CONJUGUES[2002/37]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2002National basic fee paid 
25.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/37]
23.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/44]
28.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US3419505  (MARSICO WILLIAM E) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 20 - line 33 * * column 4, line 69 - column 5, line 26 * * column 6, line 31 - line 43 * * example 17 * * claims 1-19 *;
 [PX]EP0994128  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 56 - line 57 * * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 18 * * page 5, line 28 - line 33 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US4233182  (HOFF GLEN R, et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 12 * * column 8, line 17 - line 31 * * column 9, line 2 - line 17 * * column 15, line 1 - line 8 * * examples 1,20 * * claims 29-45 *
 [X]  - TAKAHASHI HIROSHI, "Catalyst for preparation of 1,2-polybutadiene", STN CHEMICAL ABSTRAC, (19700422), XP002129466 [X] 1-10 * abstract *