Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236032

EP1236032 - CELL ANALYSIS AND SORTING APPARATUS FOR MANIPULATION OF CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02131 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRAFF, Rebecca
488 Columbus Avenue, 4
Boston, MA 02118 / US
02 / VOLDMAN, Joel
35 Davis Square, 6
Somerville, MA 02144 / US
03 / GRAY, Martha, L.
226 Pleasant Street
Arlington, MA 02476 / US
04 / SCHMIDT, Martin, A.
78 Ashley Place
Reading, MA 01867 / US
05 / TONER, Mehmet
100 Pilgrim Road
Wellesley, MA 02481 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Casey, Lindsay Joseph , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Casey, Lindsay Joseph , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date00978464.610.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US30815
Priority number, dateUS19990164643P10.11.1999         Original published format: US 164643 P
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0135071
Date:17.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1236032
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N15/14
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZELLANALYSE- UND -SORTIERVORRICHTUNG ZUR MANIPULATION VON ZELLEN[2007/27]
English:CELL ANALYSIS AND SORTING APPARATUS FOR MANIPULATION OF CELLS[2002/36]
French:APPAREIL D'ANALYSE ET DE TRI DE CELLULES SERVANT A MANIPULER DES CELLULES[2002/36]
Former [2002/36]ZELLANALYSE UND SORTIERVORRICHTUNG ZUR MANIPULATION VON ZELLEN
Entry into regional phase10.06.2002National basic fee paid 
21.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
30.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2007
29.05.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
23.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/15]
23.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200708   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5506141  (WEINREB ARYE [IL], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 25 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 20 * * column 11, lines 3-22 * * column 11, line 49 - column 12, line 13 * * column 14, line 40 - column 16, line 22 * * column 19, line 24 - column 20, line 42 *;
 [XA]WO9931503  (VOGEL HORST [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6,23 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 30 * * page 7, lines 20-34 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 31 * * page 13, lines 24-32 * [A] 7,30;
 [A]DE19712309  (NMI UNIV TUEBINGEN [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column A *;
 [A]US4894343  (TANAKA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7 * column A *