Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236347

EP1236347 - Method for using banner advertisements during commercial breaks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/36]METHOD FOR USING BANNER ADVERTISEMENTS DURING COMMERCIAL BREAKS
[2011/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2013
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JLB Ventures LLC
c/o Banner & Witcoff Ltd. 1100 13th Street NW, Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20005 / US
[2010/27]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
IsurfTV
413 Tasman Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089-1706 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAMEN, Yakov
19334 Greenwood Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / SHIRMAN, Leon
870 Seminole Way
Redwood City, CA 94062 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P.Thompson & Co.
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2002/36]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date00978601.313.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US31195
Priority number, dateUS1999044901624.11.1999         Original published format: US 449016
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0139493
Date:31.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236347
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236347
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.05.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/445, // H04N7/173
[2011/45]
Former International [2005/28]H04N5/445, G06F3/00, G06F13/00, H04N7/173
Former International [2002/36]H04N5/445, G06F3/00, G06F13/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Gebrauch von Bannerwerbungen während Werbespots[2011/45]
English:Method for using banner advertisements during commercial breaks[2011/50]
French:Procédé déstiné à l'utilisation de bandeaux publicitaires durant les pauses publicitaires[2011/45]
Former [2002/36]VERFAHREN ZUM GEBRAUCH VON BANNERWERBUNG WÄHREND WERBESPOTS
Former [2002/36]METHOD FOR USING BANNER ADVERTISEMENTS DURING COMMERCIAL BREAKS
Former [2002/36]PROCEDE DESTINE A L'UTILISATION DE PANNEAUX PUBLICITAIRES DURANT DES PAUSES PUBLICITAIRES
Entry into regional phase21.06.2002National basic fee paid 
21.06.2002Search fee paid 
21.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
16.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2012Fee for grant paid
09.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10181346.7  / EP2262263
EP10181411.9  / EP2262245
EP10181419.2  / EP2271082
EP10181429.1  / EP2262246
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2007
Opposition(s)21.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200506   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2006
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
IT18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
TR18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
IE13.11.2012
LU13.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
IT18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
TR18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
IE13.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2013/47]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
IT18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
IE13.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/33]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
IT18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
IT18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
ES29.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/11]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
IT18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
DK18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT18.04.2012
BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
PT20.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
GR19.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY18.04.2012
FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
Former [2012/48]FI18.04.2012
SE18.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9917549  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7-11 * page 10, paragraph 3; figures 2,4,5 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * abstract * [A] 12;
 [X]US4918531  (JOHNSON GENE H [US]) [X] 9,11,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 15; figure 5 *;
 [X]WO9945702  (PREVUE INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 13,14,16 * abstract * * page 22, line 25 - page 23, line 12; figure 13 *;
 [A]DE19806977  (SCHNELLE [DE], et al) [A] 13-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - line 68 * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 20; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0384388  (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 11-13,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 12 - column 6, line 46; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0901284  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0025]; claim 5 *
International search[X]US5929850  (BROADWIN ELLIOT [US], et al);
 [A]US5818441  (THROCKMORTON JOHN A [US], et al)
ExaminationWO9736424
 WO9929109
 JPS60176373
by applicantWO9917549
 US4918531
 EP0901284