Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235763

EP1235763 - GAS GENERANT MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.08.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Autoliv Development AB
Wallentinsvägen 22
447 83 Vårgårda / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AB
Wallentinsvägen 22
44783 Vargarda / SE
Inventor(s)01 / MENDENHALL, Ivan, V.
643 East Center Street
Providence, UT 84332 / US
02 / SMITH, Robert, G.
972 East 2650 North
North Ogden, UT 84414 / US
03 / TAYLOR, Robert, D.
356 S. Rosewood Drive
Hyrum, UT 84319 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date00978801.920.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000US31732
Priority number, dateUS1999045404103.12.1999         Original published format: US 454041
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0140143
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235763
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C06B21/00, C06D5/06
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2004/22]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GASERZEUGENDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2002/36]
English:GAS GENERANT MANUFACTURE[2002/36]
French:PRODUCTION DE GENERATEUR DE GAZ[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2002National basic fee paid 
31.05.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
25.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/37]
06.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200708   M06   Not yet paid
30.11.200809   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9622954  (THIOKOL CORP [US]) [A] 1,21,29 * page 29, line 16 - page 30, line 23 *;
 [A]WO9704860  (THIOKOL CORP [US]) [A] 1,21,29 * column 16, line 9 - line 13; examples 7,8; claim - *;
 [A]WO9837040  (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [A] 1,21,29 * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 21; claim - *;
 [A]WO9846529  (CORDANT TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1,21,29 * page 15, line 8 - line 30; claim - *;
 [A]US4931112  (WARDLE ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1,21,29 * column 3, line 14 - line 19; claim - *