Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162837

EP1162837 - METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING PRINTING DATA AND IMAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Change - designated statespublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IHARA, Yushi, Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
02 / KOJIMA, Takashi, Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date00979083.304.12.2000
[2001/50]
WO2000JP08583
Priority number, dateJP1999034547103.12.1999         Original published format: JP 34547199
JP1999035086609.12.1999         Original published format: JP 35086699
[2001/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0141431
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162837
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/765, G06F3/12, B41J29/38
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2004/20]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DRUCKERDATEN UND BILDDATEN[2001/50]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING PRINTING DATA AND IMAGE DATA[2001/50]
French:TRANSFERT DE DONNEES D'IMPRESSION ET DE DONNEES D'IMAGE[2001/50]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2001Translation filed 
13.08.2001National basic fee paid 
13.08.2001Search fee paid 
13.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
26.01.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH11252153  (CANON KK);
 [Y]JPH10322373  (CANON KK);
 [Y]JPH10341247  (SONY CORP);
 [A]JPH08279818  (TOSHIBA CORP)