Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235899

EP1235899 - TREATMENT OF HUMAN INFERTILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsværd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / GRONDAHL, Christian
Irisvej 19
DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Noergaard, Torsten
c/o Novo Nordisk A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Noergaard, Torsten
c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Application number, filing date00979451.223.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000DK00647
Priority number, dateDK1999000170525.11.1999         Original published format: DK 170599
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0138493
Date:31.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235899
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235899
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/00, A61K31/56
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON MENSCHLICHER UNFRUCHTBARKEIT[2002/36]
English:TREATMENT OF HUMAN INFERTILITY[2002/36]
French:TRAITEMENT DE L'INFERTILITE HUMAINE[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2002National basic fee paid 
25.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
08.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M12)
13.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2006Date of oral proceedings
18.08.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2007Fee for grant paid
29.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
CY21.03.2007
DK21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
TR21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
GR22.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
IE23.11.2007
LU23.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
CY21.03.2007
DK21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
GR22.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
IE23.11.2007
LU23.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2009/33]AT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
CY21.03.2007
DK21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
GR22.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
IE23.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/48]AT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
DK21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
GR22.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
IE23.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/29]AT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
DK21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
GR22.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/19]AT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
DK21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
GR22.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
Former [2008/08]AT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
DK21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
Former [2007/48]AT21.03.2007
BE21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
PT21.08.2007
Former [2007/46]AT21.03.2007
CH21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
Former [2007/40]CH21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
NL21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
SE21.06.2007
Former [2007/37]CH21.03.2007
FI21.03.2007
LI21.03.2007
Former [2007/36]FI21.03.2007
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9961010  (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]CA2199663  (MOSES RUTH MIRIAM [CA]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 15 * * abstract *
 [Y]  - FOULADI NASHTA A A ET AL, "Maintenance of Bovine Oocytes in Meiotonic Arrest and Subsequent Development In Vitro: A Comparative Evaluation of Antral Follicle Culture with Other Methods", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, (1998), vol. 59, pages 255 - 262, XP002901593 [Y] 1-6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod59.2.255
 [Y]  - OTTESEN J I ET AL, "The Effect of Meiosis Activating Sterol ( MAS ) and some Oxysterols on the Resumption of Meiosis in Mouse Oocytes Cultured IN VITRO", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, (1997), vol. 56, no. 1, page 97, XP002901594 [Y] 1-6 * abstract nr 57 *