Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1240278

EP1240278 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOUSLY PREPARING A STABLE WATER-FUEL EMULSION AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2009
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Total France
24, Cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
[2004/11]
Former [2002/43]For all designated states
Totalfinaelf France
Tour Total, 24, cours Michelet
92800 Puteaux / FR
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Elf Antar France
Tour Michelet, 24 Cours Michelet
92800 Puteux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULZ, Philippe
15, avenue du 11 Novembre 1918
F-69110 Sainte Foy Les Lyon / FR
02 / TANGUY, Philippe
5500-311 de Jumonville
Montreal, Quebec H1M 3L8 / CA
03 / BROCART, Benjamin
Apartment 3,3233 avenue Van Horne
Montreal, Quebec H3S 1R3 / CA
04 / MAGNIN, César
28, domaine de Sourzy
F-69700 Montagny / FR
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00979726.713.11.2000
[2002/38]
WO2000FR03162
Priority number, dateFR1999001426915.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914269
[2002/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0136569
Date:25.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1240278
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2001
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/32, B01F13/10, B01F3/08
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINU-HERSTELLUNG EINER STABILEN WASER-BRENNSTOFFEMULSION UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHREN[2002/38]
English:METHOD FOR CONTINUOUSLY PREPARING A STABLE WATER-FUEL EMULSION AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2002/38]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION EN CONTINU D'UNE EMULSION STABLE EAU-COMBUSTIBLE ET SON DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE[2002/38]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2002National basic fee paid 
17.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
15.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/48]
07.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200809   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AX]WO9907465  (APACE RES LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,15 * claims 1,11,12 * * page 14, line 11 - page 15, line 9 * * figure 1 * [X] 11;
 [DA]WO9533023  (FUEL TECH NV [NL], et al);
 [A]US4117550  (FOLLAND ROY E, et al) [A] 1,6 * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0194365  (HYDROLINE AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1,8 * claims 1,4,5 * * page 3, line 1 - line 29 *;
 [A]FR2688225  (ECOTEC [FR])