Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236359

EP1236359 - VIDEO CODING AND DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.03.2011  [2011/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[2010/13]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Ghanbari, Mohammed
14 Crome Close
Colchester Essex CO3 4QQ / GB
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Barry George William , et al
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department - PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Lloyd, Barry George William , et al
BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Application number, filing date00979749.927.11.2000
[2002/36]
WO2000GB04504
Priority number, dateGB1999002802226.11.1999         Original published format: GB 9928022
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0139509
Date:31.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236359
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236359
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/68, H04N7/46
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VIDEOKODIERUNG UND -DEKODIERUNG[2002/36]
English:VIDEO CODING AND DECODING[2002/36]
French:CODAGE ET DECODAGE VIDEO[2002/36]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2002National basic fee paid 
03.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
28.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2010Fee for grant paid
12.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
16.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
24.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0588586  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 59 *;
 [A]EP0551599  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 7 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]  - VETRO A ET AL, "True motion vectors for robust video transmission", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING '99, SAN JOSE, CA, USA, 25-27 JAN. 1999, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1998, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, vol. 3653, pt.1-2, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 230 - 240, XP000904924 [A] 1-9 * paragraph [03.3] *
 [A]  - WU S -W ET AL, "JOINT ESTIMATION OF FORWARD AND BACKWARD MOTION VECTORS FOR INTERPOLATIVE PREDICTION OF VIDEO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19940901), vol. 3, no. 5, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 684 - 687, XP000476841 [A] 2-9 * paragraph [0III] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.334976
 [A]  - YEN-LIN CHEN ET AL, "Error control for H.263 video transmission over wireless channels", ISCAS '98. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (CAT. NO.98CH36187), ISCAS '98 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, MONTEREY, CA, USA, 31 MAY-3 JUNE 1998, 1998, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-4455-3, pages 118 - 121 vol.4, XP002135949 [A] 1-9 * paragraph [02.3] * * figure 8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1998.698773
 [A]  - ARNOLD J F ET AL, "Error resilience in the MPEG-2 video coding standard for cell based networks - A review - Image Communication", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (199905), vol. 14, no. 6-8, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 607 - 633, XP004165399 [A] 1-9 * paragraph [7.2.2] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(98)00059-9