Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242416

EP1242416 - SUBSTITUTED ISOXAZOLINES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAVESTOCK, Michael, Barry
35 Gatehouse Drive
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
02 / BETTS, Michael John
Alderlay Park
Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Phillips, Neil Godfrey Alasdair
Astra Zeneca PLC
Global Intellectual Property
Mereside
Alderley Park, Macclesfield
Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Phillips, Neil Godfrey Alasdair
Astra Zeneca PLC Global Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
Application number, filing date00979755.628.11.2000
[2002/39]
WO2000GB04516
Priority number, dateGB1999002856803.12.1999         Original published format: GB 9928568
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0140222
Date:07.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242416
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242416
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D417/10, C07D261/08, C07D417/12, C07D261/12, C07D261/14, A61K31/42, A61K31/495, A61K31/54, A61K31/535, A61P31/04
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE ISOXAZOLINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIBAKTERIELLE WIRKSTOFFE[2002/39]
English:SUBSTITUTED ISOXAZOLINES AND THEIR USE AS ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS[2002/39]
French:ISOXAZOLINES SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS ANTIBACTERIENS[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2002National basic fee paid 
03.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
19.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2005Fee for grant paid
27.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
CY28.11.2005
IE28.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2007/09]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
IE28.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/51]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
IE28.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/48]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
IE28.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/30]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI13.04.2005
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9941244  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9807708  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]DE2725263  (HEINEMANN ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-13 * example 34; claim - *;
 [A]  - G. REMBARZ ET. AL., "Reaktionen von 2,6-Diallyloxy-4-alkyl(aryl)- 1,3,5-triazinen mit 1,3-Dipolen.", JOURNAL FÜR PRAKTISCHE CHEMIE, (1976), vol. 318, no. 4, pages 613 - 7, XP000973812 [A] 1-13 * page 615 - page 626; table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prac.19763180410
 [A]  - S. KANEMASA ET. AL., "Synthesis of Substituted Pyridines by a Cycloaddition Route Using Nitrile Oxides and Homoallyl Alcohols.", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (199102), vol. 64, no. 2, pages 375 - 80, XP000973808 [A] 1-13 * page 376, compound no. 4a *